blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0026969

EP0026969 - Method of bonding electrode to cation exchange membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.05.1984
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD.
No. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1981/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Oda, Yoshio
No. 435 Kami Sugetacho Hodogaya-Ku
Yokohamashi Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Morimoto, Takeshi
No. 543 Sanmaicho Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Suzuki, Kohji
2-59-1, Tsurugamine Asahi-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1981/15]
Representative(s)Warden, John Christopher, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 12-15, Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1981/15]Warden, John Christopher, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 12-15, Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1PL / GB
Application number, filing date80302611.130.07.1980
[1981/15]
Priority number, dateJP1979009609730.07.1979         Original published format: JP 9609779
[1981/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0026969
Date:15.04.1981
Language:EN
[1981/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0026969
Date:26.08.1981
Language:EN
[1981/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.1981
ClassificationIPC:C25B9/00, C25B1/46, C25B11/00, C25B13/08
[1981/15]
CPC:
C25B1/46 (EP); C25B9/23 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1981/15]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Binden einer Elektrode an eine Kationenaustauschmembrane[1981/15]
English:Method of bonding electrode to cation exchange membrane[1981/15]
French:Procédé de liaison d'une électrode à une membrane échangeuse de cations[1981/15]
File destroyed:14.07.1990
Examination procedure02.02.1982Examination requested  [1982/14]
12.01.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.1983Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1984/28]
16.01.1984Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1984/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4148979  (ASAMI SHUNICHI, et al);
 [A]US3134697  (NIEDRACH LEONARD W);
 [A]GB2009795  (GEN ELECTRIC)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.