blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0024871

EP0024871 - Compression release mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.1984
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.1984No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.07.1984 [1984/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TECUMSEH PRODUCTS COMPANY
100 East Patterson Street Tecumseh
Michigan 49286 / US
[N/P]
Former [1981/10]For all designated states
TECUMSEH PRODUCTS COMPANY
100 East Patterson Street
Tecumseh Michigan 49286 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kaufman, Vernon R.
10634 Crestview Drive
Cedarburg Wisconsin 53012 / US
02 / Guntly, Thomas G.
611 South Main Street
Hartford Wisconsin 53027 / US
03 / Kelly, William C.
279 Ivy Place
West Bend Wisconsin 53045 / US
[1981/10]
Representative(s)Webb, Frederick Ronald, et al
G.F. Redfern & Co. Marlborough Lodge 14 Farncombe Road Worthing
West Sussex BN11 2BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1981/10]Webb, Frederick Ronald, et al
G.F. Redfern & Co. Marlborough Lodge 14 Farncombe Road
Worthing West Sussex BN11 2BT / GB
Application number, filing date80302861.219.08.1980
[1981/10]
Priority number, dateUS1979007185204.09.1979         Original published format: US 71852
[1981/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0024871
Date:11.03.1981
Language:EN
[1981/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0024871
Date:25.03.1981
Language:EN
[1981/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0024871
Date:20.07.1983
Language:EN
[1983/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.1981
ClassificationIPC:F01L13/08, F02N17/08
[1981/10]
CPC:
F02N19/004 (EP,US); F01L13/08 (EP,US); F01L3/205 (EP,US);
F02B63/02 (EP,US); F02B2075/025 (EP,US); Y10T137/7843 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1981/10]
TitleGerman:Dekompressionsmechanismus[1981/10]
English:Compression release mechanism[1981/10]
French:Mécanisme de décompression[1981/10]
Examination procedure21.04.1981Examination requested  [1981/27]
26.05.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.1982Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
17.01.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.1983Fee for grant paid
12.02.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.04.1984No opposition filed within time limit [1984/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2689552  (KIEKHAEFER ELMER C);
 US3008459  [ ] (KAUFMAN VERNON R);
 [D]US3417740  (PERICWITZ ROBERT E);
 US3893440  [ ] (DOOLEY JAMES LINVILLE);
 [A]US3929116  (PETERSON BRENT L)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.