blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0027045

EP0027045 - Bottom sheet separator-feeder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.1985
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.01.1986 [1986/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 020 Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [1981/15]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square - 020
Rochester New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lohr, S. Warren
80 Indiana Street
Rochester New York 14609 / US
02 / Silverberg, Morton
23 Old Pond Road
Rochester New York / US
[1985/04]
Former [1981/15]01 / Lohr, Warren S.
80 Indiana Street
Rochester New York 14609 / US
02 / Silverberg, Morton
23 Old Pond Road
Rochester New York / US
Representative(s)Frain, Timothy John, et al
Rank Xerox Limited
Patent Department
364 Euston Road
London NW1 3BL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/31]Frain, Timothy John, et al
Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road
London NW1 3BL / GB
Former [1981/15]Prior, Nicholas J. European Patent Attorney
Rank Xerox Patent Department 338 Euston Road
London NW1 3BH / GB
Application number, filing date80303500.503.10.1980
[1981/15]
Priority number, dateUS1979008159103.10.1979         Original published format: US 81591
US1979008149803.10.1979         Original published format: US 81498
US1979008159203.10.1979         Original published format: US 81592
US1979008159503.10.1979         Original published format: US 81595
US1979008159603.10.1979         Original published format: US 81596
[1981/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0027045
Date:15.04.1981
Language:EN
[1981/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0027045
Date:23.01.1985
Language:EN
[1985/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.1981
ClassificationIPC:G03G15/00, B65H1/06
[1981/15]
CPC:
G03G15/60 (EP); B65H3/126 (EP); B65H3/48 (EP);
B65H83/02 (EP); G03B27/6264 (EP); G03G2215/00185 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1981/15]
TitleGerman:Von der Stapelunterseite abfördernde Blattzufuhrvorrichtung[1981/15]
English:Bottom sheet separator-feeder[1981/15]
French:Séparateur et entraîneur des feuilles en fin de pile[1981/15]
Examination procedure22.08.1981Examination requested  [1981/44]
02.03.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.09.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
06.07.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.1984Fee for grant paid
14.09.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.10.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1986/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.1984Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchAT353221B  [ ];
 DE969125  [ ];
 DE2822692  [ ];
 DE2550606  [ ];
 GB1287904  [ ];
 FR941321  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.