blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0030120

EP0030120 - Transmission apparatus for four-wheel drive motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  16.02.1991
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1981/23]For all designated states
FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kodama, Masayuki
940-181, Utsugimachi
Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP
02 / Makishima, Sadao
725, Nobe
Akigawa-shi Tokyo / JP
[1981/23]
Representative(s)Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas, et al
BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1981/23]Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas, et al
BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road
London EC1R 0DS / GB
Application number, filing date80304241.526.11.1980
[1981/23]
Priority number, dateJP1979015462429.11.1979         Original published format: JP 15462479
[1981/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0030120
Date:10.06.1981
Language:EN
[1981/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0030120
Date:24.03.1982
Language:EN
[1982/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0030120
Date:02.01.1985
Language:EN
[1985/01]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0030120
Date:03.04.1991
Language:EN
[1991/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.1982
ClassificationIPC:F16H1/38, B60K17/34, B60K5/04
[1985/01]
CPC:
B60K17/344 (EP,US); B60K5/04 (EP,US); F16H3/0915 (EP,US);
F16H37/02 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1982/12]F16H1/38, B60K17/34
Former IPC [1981/23]F16H1/38, B60K17/22
Designated contracting statesCH,   FR,   IT,   LI,   SE [1981/23]
TitleGerman:Getriebe für Motorfahrzeug mit Vierradantrieb[1981/23]
English:Transmission apparatus for four-wheel drive motor vehicle[1981/23]
French:Transmission pour véhicule à moteur avec quatre roues motrices[1981/23]
Examination procedure21.09.1982Examination requested  [1982/48]
08.06.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
25.05.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.1984Fee for grant paid
20.07.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.10.1985  30.10.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Steyr- Daimler- Puch Aktiengesellschaft
Kärntner Ring 7
A-1010 Wien 1 / AT
Opponent's representative
Schieschke, Klaus, et al, et al
Patentanwälte
Eder & Schieschke
Elisabethstrasse 34
80796 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1985/50]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.1985  30.10.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Steyr- Daimler- Puch Aktiengesellschaft
Kärntner Ring 7
A-1010 Wien 1 / AT
Opponent's representative
Schieschke, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. E. Eder Dipl.-Ing. K. Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34
D-80796 München / DE
04.11.1985Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.05.1986Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.06.1986Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: {0})
07.10.1986Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
24.05.1988Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.05.1990Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.05.1990Date of oral proceedings
01.06.1990Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.11.1990Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
25.01.1991Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition25.07.1988Appeal received No.  T0371/88
22.09.1988Statement of grounds filed
13.09.1989Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1989/37]
15.01.1990Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1990/03]
29.05.1990Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
17.10.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.1984Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3848691  (DOLAN C);
 [A]US3470766  (MAGG ALFRED, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.