blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0025748

EP0025748 - Device for transmitting digitally and for displaying graphics and/or characters to and on a screen [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.1984
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.1984No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.07.1984 [1984/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Etablissement Public de Diffusion dit "Télédiffusion de France"
21-27 rue Barbès
F-92120 Montrouge / FR
For all designated states
Lorig, Bernard
18, rue de Brest
F-35000 Rennes / FR
[N/P]
Former [1981/12]For all designated states
Etablissement Public de Diffusion dit "Télédiffusion de France"
21-27 rue Barbès
F-92120 Montrouge / FR
For all designated states
Lorig, Bernard
18, rue de Brest
F-35000 Rennes / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Lorig, Bernard
18, rue de Brest
F-35000 Rennes / FR
02 / Rahuel, Jean-Claude
12, Square de Tanouarn
F-35000 Rennes / FR
03 / Roux, Catherine
32, Boulevard de Chézy
F-35000 Rennes / FR
[1981/12]
Representative(s)Mongrédien, André, et al
c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu
F-75008 Paris / FR
[1981/12]
Application number, filing date80401266.405.09.1980
[1981/12]
Priority number, dateFR1979002278012.09.1979         Original published format: FR 7922780
[1981/12]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0025748
Date:25.03.1981
Language:FR
[1981/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0025748
Date:20.07.1983
Language:FR
[1983/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.1981
ClassificationIPC:G08C21/00, G09G1/16
[1981/12]
CPC:
G08C21/00 (EP,US); G09G5/393 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1981/12]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur digitalen Übertragung und bildlichen Darstellung von Graphiken und/oder Zeichen auf einen Bildschirm[1981/12]
English:Device for transmitting digitally and for displaying graphics and/or characters to and on a screen[1981/12]
French:Dispositif de transmission numérique et affichage de graphismes et/ou de caractères sur un écran[1981/12]
Examination procedure28.08.1981Examination requested  [1981/44]
02.11.1982Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
17.01.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.1983Fee for grant paid
11.03.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.04.1984No opposition filed within time limit [1984/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchUS4016544  [ ] (MORITA TAKAYA, et al);
 FR2338531  [ ] (NUGRAPHICS INC [US])
    [ ] - ICC'79 CONFERENCE RECORD, Vol. 4 10-14 Juin 1979 Boston US B. LORIG et al.: "Teleboard System", pages 56.4.1. - 56.4.3 * Figures 1,2; page 56.4.1, parapraphe II-1: "The graphic processor", page 56.4.2: paragraphe II-2: "Display terminal".
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.