blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0017602

EP0017602 - 2-Phenyl-4-pyrone derivatives, process for their preparation and their use as fungicides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RHONE-POULENC AGROCHIMIE
14-20, rue Pierre Baizet
69009 Lyon / FR
[N/P]
Former [1980/21]For all designated states
RHONE-POULENC AGROCHIMIE
14-20, rue Pierre Baizet
F-69009 Lyon / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Guigues, François
936 avenue Victor Hugo
F-69140 Rillieux / FR
02 / Trinh, Stéphane
25 Boulevard de la République
F-69410 - Champagne au Mont d'Or / FR
[1980/21]
Representative(s)Chaumette, Michel, et al
RHONE-POULENC AGROCHIMIE BP 9163-09
69263 Lyon Cedex 1 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1980/21]Chaumette, Michel, et al
RHONE-POULENC AGROCHIMIE BP 9163-09
F-69263 Lyon Cedex 1 / FR
Application number, filing date80420038.426.03.1980
[1980/21]
Priority number, dateFR1979000856928.03.1979         Original published format: FR 798569
[1980/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0017602
Date:15.10.1980
Language:FR
[1980/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0017602
Date:20.10.1982
Language:FR
[1982/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.1980
ClassificationIPC:C07D309/38, A01N43/16
[1980/21]
CPC:
C07D309/38 (EP,US); A01N43/16 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [1980/21]
TitleGerman:2-Phenyl-4-pyron-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Fungizide[1980/21]
English:2-Phenyl-4-pyrone derivatives, process for their preparation and their use as fungicides[1980/21]
French:Dérivés de la phényl-2-pyrone-4, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation comme fongicides[1980/21]
Examination procedure18.04.1980Examination requested  [1980/21]
03.07.1981Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
19.08.1981Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.1981Fee for grant paid
08.10.1981Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.07.1983No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.04.1980AT   M02   Not yet paid
28.04.1980BE   M02   Not yet paid
28.04.1980CH   M02   Not yet paid
28.04.1980DE   M02   Not yet paid
28.04.1980FR   M02   Not yet paid
28.04.1980GB   M02   Not yet paid
28.04.1980IT   M02   Not yet paid
28.04.1980LU   M02   Not yet paid
28.04.1980NL   M02   Not yet paid
28.04.1980SE   M02   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.198203   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL20.10.1982
AT01.11.1982
BE26.03.1983
SE27.03.1983
CH31.03.1983
LU31.03.1983
[1999/52]
Former [1984/28]NL20.10.1982
AT01.11.1982
BE26.03.1983
SE27.03.1983
CH31.03.1983
Former [1984/06]NL20.10.1982
AT01.11.1982
SE27.03.1983
CH31.03.1983
Former [1983/49]NL20.10.1982
AT01.11.1982
Former [1983/43]NL20.10.1982
Documents cited:SearchUS4060533  [ ] (NADELSON JEFFREY)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.