blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0029803

EP0029803 - Organic polymeric materials stabilized with calcium stearoyl lactate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1981/22]Organic polymeric materials stabilized with acylated hydroxy acid type compounds
[1985/25]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.04.1986
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 05.02.2003  [2003/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
K.K. Musashino Kagaku Kenkyusho
1-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
CIBA-GEIGY AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1981/22]For all designated states
K.K. Musashino Kagaku Kenkyusho
1-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
CIBA-GEIGY AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
CH-4002 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Yukawa, Muneaki
19-5 Shimizu 3-Chome Suginami-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1981/22]
Representative(s)Stamm, Otto Andreas, et al
Patentabteilung der CIBA-GEIGY AG Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1981/22]Stamm, Otto, et al
Patentabteilung der CIBA-GEIGY AG Postfach
CH-4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date80810323.827.10.1980
[1981/22]
Priority number, dateJP1979014117202.11.1979         Original published format: JP 14117279
JP1980004275503.04.1980         Original published format: JP 4275580
[1981/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0029803
Date:03.06.1981
Language:EN
[1981/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0029803
Date:20.01.1982
Language:EN
[1982/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0029803
Date:19.06.1985
Language:EN
[1985/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.1981
ClassificationIPC:C08K5/11, C08L23/02, C08L51/04, C08L59/02
[1985/25]
CPC:
C08K5/10 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1982/02]C08K5/10, C08L23/02, C08L51/04, C08L59/02
Former IPC [1981/22]C08K5/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1981/22]
TitleGerman:Mit Calcium-Stearoyl-Lactat stabilisierte organische polymere Materialien[1985/25]
English:Organic polymeric materials stabilized with calcium stearoyl lactate[1985/25]
French:Matières organiques plastiques stabilisées avec de sel de calcium du lactate de stearyle[1985/25]
Former [1981/22]Mit acylierten, Hydroxylsäuregruppen enthaltenden Verbindungen stabilisierte organische polymere Materialien
Former [1981/22]Organic polymeric materials stabilized with acylated hydroxy acid type compounds
Former [1981/22]Matières organiques plastiques stabilisées avec des composés de type hydroxyacides acylés
Examination procedure29.10.1980Examination requested  [1981/22]
13.09.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
16.05.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.1984Fee for grant paid
15.12.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.03.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.1984Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.06.1985
BE19.06.1985
CH19.06.1985
LI19.06.1985
NL19.06.1985
SE19.06.1985
[2003/06]
Former [1989/19]AT19.06.1985
BE19.06.1985
CH19.06.1985
LI19.06.1985
NL19.06.1985
Former [1988/04]AT19.06.1985
BE19.06.1985
NL19.06.1985
Former [1986/45]AT19.06.1985
NL19.06.1985
Former [1986/30]NL19.06.1985
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4146548  (FORSYTHE CURTIS J);
 [P]DE2903553  (HOECHST AG)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.