Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0035024

EP0035024 - LOOSELEAF NOTEBOOKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.07.1984
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.1984Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.09.1984 [1984/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ERRICHIELLO, Dominic R.
389 Meadowlark Road
Bloomingdale, IL 60108 / US
[1981/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1981/36]
Representative(s)Burford, Anthony Frederick , et al
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London
WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1982/40]Burford, Anthony Frederick , et al
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Former [1981/36]Burford, Anthony Frederick
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date80901638.906.08.1980
[1981/36]
WO1980US01031
Priority number, dateUS1979006386206.08.1979         Original published format: US 63862
[1981/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO8100379
Date:19.02.1981
[1981/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0035024
Date:09.09.1981
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1981
[1981/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.1983
ClassificationInternational:B42D3/00, B42D3/12
[1981/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1981/36]
TitleGerman:NOTIZBÜCHER MIT LOSEN BLÄTTERN[1981/36]
English:LOOSELEAF NOTEBOOKS[1981/36]
French:CALEPINS A FEUILLES MOBILES[1981/36]
File destroyed:14.07.1990
Entry into regional phase24.04.1981National basic fee paid 
24.04.1981Search fee paid 
24.04.1981Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.1981Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.1981Examination requested  [1981/36]
01.03.1984Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1984/39]
17.04.1984Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1984/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.198304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:SearchFR2247070  [ ];
 FR1031527  [ ];
 DE1180497  [ ];
 DE2749854  [ ];
 US4011940  [ ];
 US3165337  [ ]
International search[A]US4063369  ;
 [A]US4000951  ;
 [A]US3981522  ;
 [A]US3912140  ;
 [A]US3126891  ;
 [A]US3088753  ;
 [A]US3306405  ;
 [A]US3019486  ;
 [A]US2937728  ;
 [A]US2801002  ;
 [A]US2477806  ;
 [A]US2088953  ;
 [A]US1524647  ;
 [A]US1520932  ;
 [A]US1136598  ;
 [A]DE2303218  ;
 [A]GB1436453  ;
 [A]GB840343  ;
 [A]DE2359041