Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0034706

EP0034706 - Process and apparatus for ion etching or for plasma C.V.D. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.1985
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.05.1985 [1985/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VEB Zentrum für Forschung und Technologie Mikroelektronik
Karl-Marx-Strasse
DDR-8080 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/35]For all designated states
VEB Zentrum für Forschung und Technologie Mikroelektronik
Karl-Marx-Strasse
DDR-8080 Dresden / DD
Inventor(s)01 / Rudakoff, Georg, Prof.Dr. Habil.
Leo-Sachse-Strasse 34
DDR-6900 Jena / DD
02 / Tiller, Hans-Jürgen, Dr.sc.
Emil-Wölk-Strasse 2
DDR-6900 Jena / DD
03 / Göbel, Roland, Dipl.-Phys.
Heimstättenstrasse 12
DDR-6900 Jena / DD
04 / Voigt, Reinhard, Dipl-Phys.
Gerh.Hauptmann-Strasse 18
DDR-8102 Langebrück / DD
05 / Schade, Klaus, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Florian-Geyer-Strasse 15/48
DDR-8019 Dresden / DD
06 / Kosch, Wolfgang
Geschw.-Scholl-Strasse 94
DDR-8080 Dresden / DD
07 / Gehmlich, Konrad, Dipl.-Phys.
Bautzner Strasse 129
DDR-8060 Dresden / DD
[1981/35]
Representative(s)Braun, André sr. , et al
A. Braun, Braun, Héritier, Eschmann AG Patentanwälte Holbeinstrasse 36-38
CH-4051 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1981/35]Braun, André , et al
A. Braun, Braun, Héritier, Eschmann AG Patentanwälte Holbeinstrasse 36-38
CH-4051 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date81100455.522.01.1981
[1981/35]
Priority number, dateDD1956000218908.02.1980         Original published format: DD 218956
[1981/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0034706
Date:02.09.1981
Language:DE
[1981/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0034706
Date:09.09.1981
Language:DE
[1981/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0034706
Date:02.05.1984
Language:DE
[1984/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.1981
ClassificationInternational:C23F1/00, C23C11/00, C23C15/00
[1981/35]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1981/35]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Plasmaätzen oder zur Plasma CVD[1981/35]
English:Process and apparatus for ion etching or for plasma C.V.D.[1981/35]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour le décapage par un plasma ou pour le revêtement chimique à partir de la phase vapeur dans un plasma[1981/35]
File destroyed:05.09.1996
Examination procedure24.12.1981Examination requested  [1982/10]
26.01.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
13.10.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.1984Fee for grant paid
02.01.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.02.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:SearchGB1391842  [ ];
 [A]DE2541719  ;
 [AD]DE2251571  ;
 [AP]EP0016603
ExaminationDE2810554