Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0033936

EP0033936 - Lock with swingable member for a vehicle, in particular a bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  29.07.1994
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aug. Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG
August-Winkhaus-Strasse 78
D-48291 Telgte / DE
[1985/36]
Former [1981/33]For all designated states
Firma Aug. Winkhaus
August-Winkhaus-Strasse 78
D-4404 Telgte / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Waterkamp, Manfred
Münster Strasse 11
D-4405 Nottuln / DE
02 / Kortenbrede, Ludger
Delsener Heide 14
D-4404 Telgte / DE
[1981/33]
Representative(s)Weickmann, Heinrich , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/31]Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20
D-81635 München / DE
Former [1981/33]Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Weickmann Dipl.-Phys.Dr. K. Fincke Dipl.-Ing. F.A. Weickmann Dipl.-Chem. B. Huber Dr.-Ing. H. Liska M hlstrasse 22
D-8000 München 86 / DE
Application number, filing date81100740.002.02.1981
[1981/33]
Priority number, dateDE1980300521712.02.1980         Original published format: DE 3005217
[1981/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0033936
Date:19.08.1981
Language:DE
[1981/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0033936
Date:11.08.1982
Language:DE
[1982/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0033936
Date:29.01.1986
Language:DE
[1986/05]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0033936
Date:14.09.1994
Language:DE
[1994/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.1982
ClassificationInternational:B62H5/16
[1981/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1981/33]
TitleGerman:Schwenkbügelschloss für ein Fahrzeug, insbesondere ein Zweiradfahrzeug[1981/33]
English:Lock with swingable member for a vehicle, in particular a bicycle[1981/33]
French:Serrure à partie pivotante pour un véhicule, en particulier une bicyclette[1981/33]
Examination procedure01.09.1982Examination requested  [1982/45]
21.11.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
21.08.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.10.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
24.12.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
16.07.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.1985Fee for grant paid
13.09.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.10.1986  10.12.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Basta Laasefabrik A/S
Lilleoebakken
DK-4220 Korsoer / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/23]
Opponent(s)01  29.10.1986  10.12.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Basta Laasefabrik A/S
Lilleoebakken
DK-4220 Korsoer / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [1986/52]
Opponent(s)01  29.10.1986  10.12.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Basta Laasefabrik A/S
Lilleoebakken
DK-4220 Korsoer / DK
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
12.12.1986Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.03.1987Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.04.1987Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
29.06.1987Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
31.03.1988Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05)
19.08.1988Reply to a communication from the opposition division
21.09.1988Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.1988Reply to a communication from the opposition division
02.05.1990Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03)
13.08.1990Reply to a communication from the opposition division
03.09.1991Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
03.02.1994Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.02.1994Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.04.1994Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
19.07.1994Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition14.10.1991Appeal received No.  T0799/91
03.01.1992Statement of grounds filed
03.02.1994Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
03.02.1994Date of oral proceedings
10.02.1994Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE29.01.1986
FR29.01.1986
IT29.01.1986
AT02.02.1986
GB18.11.1988
[2004/37]
Former [2000/03]BE29.01.1986
IT29.01.1986
AT02.02.1986
GB18.11.1988
Former [1999/42]BE29.01.1986
IT29.01.1986
AT02.02.1986
GB29.03.1986
Former [1989/27]BE29.01.1986
AT02.02.1986
GB29.03.1986
Former [1989/08]BE29.01.1986
AT02.02.1986
Former [1988/04]BE29.01.1986
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4180998  (HELLMAN ERKKI [FI]);
 [Y]DE1755954  (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST);
 [A]CH278506  (VELOSFABRIK COSMOS B SCHILD & [CH]);
 [A]DE616301  (ALEX WASEM);
 [A]GB260267  (EDOUARD SOULLIERE);
 [A]FR1002281  ;
 [A]DE2360936  (GKN STENMAN AB)