blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0035248

EP0035248 - Process and apparatus for the biological purification of waste water [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.05.1985
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.07.1985 [1985/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Linde AG
Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/36]For all designated states
Linde Aktiengesellschaft
Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21
D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Reimann, Hans, Dr.
Rudolf-Wilke-Weg 21
D-8000 München 71 / DE
[1981/36]
Representative(s)Schaefer, Gerhard
Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/36]Schaefer, Gerhard, Dr.
Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung
D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Application number, filing date81101413.326.02.1981
[1981/36]
Priority number, dateDE1980300778229.02.1980         Original published format: DE 3007782
[1981/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0035248
Date:09.09.1981
Language:DE
[1981/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0035248
Date:11.07.1984
Language:DE
[1984/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.1981
ClassificationIPC:C02F3/12, C02F1/52
[1981/36]
CPC:
C02F3/1215 (EP); C02F1/5236 (EP); C02F3/121 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1981/36]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur biologischen Reinigung von Abwasser[1981/36]
English:Process and apparatus for the biological purification of waste water[1981/36]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la purification biologique d'eau usée[1981/36]
Examination procedure06.08.1981Examination requested  [1981/42]
03.05.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
30.08.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.1983Fee for grant paid
12.10.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.04.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.198404   M06   Fee paid on   18.04.1984
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchFR844812  [ ] (SALUBRA ETS)
    [ ] - Journal of Water Pollution Control Federation, Band 51, Nr. 4, April 1979, seiten 783-797 Washington D.C., U.S.A. A. AZKONA et al.: "Phosphorus Removal using waste Pickle Liquor"
ExaminationDE1642399
 DE2321725
 DE2548701
 DE2640875
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.