Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0036530

EP0036530 - Radiation measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.02.1985
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/39]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Grassmann, Peter, Dr.-Ing.
Schronfeld 12
D-8520 Erlangen / DE
02 / Pfeiler, Manfred, Dr.-Ing.
Ludwig-Thoma-Strasse 25
D-8520 Erlangen / DE
[1981/39]
Application number, filing date81101594.005.03.1981
[1981/39]
Priority number, dateDE1980300972313.03.1980         Original published format: DE 3009723
[1981/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0036530
Date:30.09.1981
Language:DE
[1981/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0036530
Date:27.04.1983
Language:DE
[1983/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.1983
ClassificationInternational:G01T1/20
[1981/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1981/39]
TitleGerman:Strahlenmesseinrichtung[1981/39]
English:Radiation measuring device[1981/39]
French:Dispositif de mesure de rayonnement[1981/39]
File destroyed:13.07.1991
Examination procedure28.10.1981Examination requested  [1982/01]
03.04.1984Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1985/17]
07.11.1984Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1985/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.04.198404   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]GB2056671  (AMERICAN SCIENCE & ENG INC);
 [Y]US4179100  (SASHIN DONALD [US], et al);
 [Y]US4181856  (BONE PHILLIP R [GB]);
 [A]DE2500643  (KOCH & STERZEL KG);
 [A]US4140909  (BROWN DALE M, et al)