Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0036661

EP0036661 - Process for improving the properties of a cracking catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  05.11.1987
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phillips Petroleum Company
5th and Keeler Bartlesville
Oklahoma 74004 / US
[N/P]
Former [1981/39]For all designated states
PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY
5th and Keeler
Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Roberts, John Scott
1505 S.E. Manor Drive
Bartlesville, OK / US
02 / Bertus, Brent Joseph
1318 S.E. Swan Drive
Bartlesville, OK / US
03 / McKay, Dwight Lamar
1721 Skyline Drive
Bartlesville, OK / US
04 / Mark, Harold Wayne
3313 CE Tuxedo Blvd.
Bartlesville, OK / US
[1981/39]
Representative(s)Dost, Wolfgang , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Dost, Wolfgang , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Former [1983/01]Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1
D-81679 München / DE
Former [1981/39]Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.
Patent- u. Rechtsanwälte Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg Galileiplatz 1
D-8000 München 80 / DE
Application number, filing date81102182.323.03.1981
[1981/39]
Priority number, dateUS1980013271924.03.1980         Original published format: US 132719
[1981/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0036661
Date:30.09.1981
Language:EN
[1981/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.1981
ClassificationInternational:C10G11/02, B01J23/92, B01J23/14, B01J37/20, B01J37/28, C07F9/165
[1981/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1981/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verbesserung der Eigenschaften eines Crackkatalysators[1981/39]
English:Process for improving the properties of a cracking catalyst[1981/39]
French:Procédé pour améliorer les propriétés d'un catalyseur de craquage[1981/39]
Examination procedure29.10.1981Examination requested  [1982/01]
22.09.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
02.05.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.1985Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1987/52]
28.07.1987Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/52]
Appeal following examination28.02.1985Appeal received No.  T0155/85
03.06.1985Statement of grounds filed
28.07.1987Date of oral proceedings
30.07.1987Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.1986Renewal fee patent year 06
11.02.1987Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:SearchUS4031002  [ ] (MCKAY DWIGHT L);
 GB1510155  [ ] (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO);
 GB1506773  [ ] (TOA NENRYO KOGYO KK);
 US4025458  [ ] (MCKAY DWIGHT L)