Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0036661 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0036661



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 198
09.03.1993 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.03.1992 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.04.1990 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.03.1989 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.03.1988 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.11.1987 Closing of application Search / examination 1
08.10.1987 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.07.1987 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
28.07.1987 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.07.1987 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
28.07.1987 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 13
28.07.1987 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
23.05.1987 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.05.1987 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.05.1987 Communication (no form) Appeal 3
08.05.1987 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
07.07.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
01.07.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.12.1985 Claims Appeal 1
18.12.1985 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.11.1985 Claims Appeal 1
18.11.1985 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.08.1985 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
12.07.1985 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
03.06.1985 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
28.02.1985 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.02.1985 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.02.1985 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.01.1985 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
22.01.1985 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
21.08.1984 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 6
08.06.1984 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.06.1984 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.02.1984 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.12.1983 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.12.1983 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.08.1983 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
02.05.1983 Claims Search / examination 3
02.05.1983 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
13.04.1983 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.03.1983 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.02.1983 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.01.1983 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.09.1982 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.11.1981 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
29.10.1981 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 2
02.10.1981 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
05.08.1981 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.06.1981 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.06.1981 European search report Search / examination 1
23.03.1981 Claims Search / examination 4
23.03.1981 Description Search / examination 34
23.03.1981 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.03.1981 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.03.1981 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.03.1981 Priority document Search / examination 47
23.03.1981 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8