Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0037577

EP0037577 - Nonlinear resistor and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.12.1985
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.02.1986 [1986/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1981/41]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miyoshi, Tadahiko
1047-295, Nakaiyama
Moriyamacho Hitachi-shi / JP
02 / Yamazaki, Takeo
37-6, Moriyamacho-2-chome
Hitachi-shi / JP
03 / Maeda, Kunihiro
6-3-401, Nishinarusawacho-1-chome
Hitachi-shi / JP
04 / Takahashi, Ken
161-551, Ishinazakacho
Hitachi-shi / JP
05 / Oowada, Siniti
2428-206, Oaza Koya
Katsuta-shi / JP
[1981/41]
Representative(s)von Füner, Alexander , et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Postfach 95 01 60
81517 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/47]von Füner, Alexander, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Postfach 95 01 60
D-81517 München / DE
Former [1981/41]Von Füner, Alexander, Dr.
K.L. Schiff Dr. A. von Funer Dipl.-Ing. P. Strehl Dr. U. Schübel-Hopf Dipl.-Ing. D. Ebbinghaus Dr.-Ing. D. Finck Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
D-8000 München 90 / DE
Application number, filing date81102586.506.04.1981
[1981/41]
Priority number, dateJP1980004460607.04.1980         Original published format: JP 4460680
[1981/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0037577
Date:14.10.1981
Language:EN
[1981/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0037577
Date:06.02.1985
Language:EN
[1985/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.1981
ClassificationInternational:H01C7/10, H01C7/12, H01B1/08
[1981/41]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI,   SE [1981/41]
TitleGerman:Nichtlinearer Widerstand und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[1981/41]
English:Nonlinear resistor and process for producing the same[1981/41]
French:Résistance non-linéaire et procédé pour sa fabrication[1981/41]
Examination procedure24.02.1982Examination requested  [1982/19]
04.03.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
27.07.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.1984Fee for grant paid
06.11.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.11.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1986/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2321755  ;
 US3938069  [ ];
 FR2421494  [ ];
 US3863193  [ ]
ExaminationUS3723175