Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0039850

EP0039850 - Process for making link belts and apparatus for carrying it into effect [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  31.12.1988
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kerber, Heinz
Himberg 12
D-6731 Weidenthal / DE
[1981/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Kerber, Heinz
Himberg 12
D-6731 Weidenthal / DE
02 / Kerber, Hella
Himberg 12
D-6731 Weidenthal / DE
[1981/46]
Representative(s)Goetz, Rupert , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/32]Goetz, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date81103306.702.05.1981
[1981/46]
Priority number, dateDE1980301737807.05.1980         Original published format: DE 3017378
[1981/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0039850
Date:18.11.1981
Language:DE
[1981/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0039850
Date:02.05.1984
Language:DE
[1984/18]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0039850
Date:15.02.1989
Language:DE
[1989/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.1981
ClassificationInternational:D21F1/00, B21F27/18, B21F43/00
[1981/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1982/06]
Former [1981/46]AT,  BE,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und eine zu dessen Ausführung dienende Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Drahtgliederbändern[1984/18]
English:Process for making link belts and apparatus for carrying it into effect[1981/46]
French:Procédé et appareil pour sa mise en oeuvre lors de la fabrication de bandes à chaînons[1981/46]
Former [1981/46]Verfahren und eine zu dessen Ausführung dienende Maschine zum Herstellen von Drahtgliederbändern
Examination procedure28.08.1981Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT, LU
10.11.1981Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.11.1981Examination requested  [1982/10]
28.01.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
12.10.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.1983Fee for grant paid
07.12.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP83112252.8  / EP0117304
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.01.1985  12.03.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Filztuchverwaltungs GmbH
Nordendstrasse 68-70
D-64546 Mörfelden-Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Paul, Dieter-Alfred
Paul & Albrecht
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Stresemannallee 4b
41460 Neuss / DE
 02  31.01.1985  12.03.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Jürgens Maschinenbau GmbH & Co. KG
D-4407 Emsdetten / DE
Opponent's representative
Meyer, Ludgerus
Patentanwälte
Meyer, Stach, Vonnemann
Jungfernstieg 38
D-2000 Hamburg 36 / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1988/19]
Opponent(s)01  31.01.1985  12.03.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Filztuchverwaltungs GmbH
Nordendstrasse 68-70
D-64546 Mörfelden-Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Fichtestrasse 18
D-41464 Neuss / DE
 02  31.01.1985  12.03.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Jürgens Maschinenbau GmbH & Co. KG
D-4407 Emsdetten / DE
Opponent's representative
Meyer, Ludgerus
Patentanwälte Meyer, Stach, Vonnemann Jungfernstieg 38
D-2000 Hamburg 36 / DE
Former [1985/15]
Opponent(s)01  31.01.1985   
Filztuchverwaltungs GmbH
Nordendstrasse 68-70
D-64546 Mörfelden-Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Fichtestrasse 18
D-41464 Neuss / DE
 02  31.01.1985   
Jürgens Maschinenbau GmbH & Co. KG
D-4407 Emsdetten / DE
Opponent's representative
Stach, Harald, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Adenauerallee 30
D-2000 Hamburg 1 / DE
23.05.1985Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.09.1985Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.09.1985Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M05)
20.02.1986Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
23.10.1986Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.04.1988Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.09.1988Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
06.12.1988Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition20.12.1986Appeal received No.  T0028/87
23.02.1987Statement of grounds filed
29.04.1988Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
29.04.1988Date of oral proceedings
02.05.1988Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.06.1981IT   M02   Not yet paid
02.06.1981LU   M02   Not yet paid
Documents cited:SearchUS3874061  [ ];
 DE3001472  [ ];
 DE2158372  [ ]