Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0045063

EP0045063 - Memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.1989
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.1989 [1989/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1982/05]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kobayashi, Satoru
Nippon Electric Co., Ltd. 33-1, Shiba Gochome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
02 / Matsue, Shigeki
Nippon Electric Co., Ltd. 33-1, Shiba Gochome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
[1982/05]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/01]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
D-20148 Hamburg / DE
Former [1982/05]Glawe, Richard, Dr.-Ing.
Dr.-Ing. Richard Glawe Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Delfs Dr. Walter Moll Dr. Ulrich Mengdehl Dr. Heinrich Niebuhr Rothenbaumchaussee 58
D-2000 Hamburg 13 / DE
Application number, filing date81105827.023.07.1981
[1982/05]
Priority number, dateJP1980010085023.07.1980         Original published format: JP 10085080
[1982/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0045063
Date:03.02.1982
Language:EN
[1982/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0045063
Date:10.02.1982
Language:EN
[1982/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0045063
Date:04.01.1989
Language:EN
[1989/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1981
ClassificationInternational:G11C8/00
[1982/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1982/05]
TitleGerman:Speicheranlage[1982/05]
English:Memory device[1982/05]
French:Dispositif de mémoire[1982/05]
MiscellaneousEPB 1985/29: Divisional application 85103712 filed on 28.03.85
Examination procedure06.08.1982Examination requested  [1982/42]
03.11.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.04.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
22.01.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.1988Fee for grant paid
28.04.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP85103712.7  / EP0162234
Opposition(s)05.10.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.1986Renewal fee patent year 06
21.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 07
19.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US3930239  ;
 US3857046  [ ];
 [A]US4120048
ExaminationUS3969706
 EP0030007