blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0047444

EP0047444 - Variable sprinkler for different irrigation requirements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.04.1985
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.06.1985 [1985/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Perrot-Regnerbau GmbH & Co.
Bischofstrasse 54
D-7260 Calw / DE
[1982/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Schanz, Friedrich
Eduard-Conz-Strasse 27
D-7260 Calw / DE
02 / Schucker, Emil
Lange Steige 51
D-7260 Calw / DE
03 / Perrot, Alexander
Weilemer Weg 1
D-7262 Althengstett / DE
[1982/11]
Representative(s)Mayer, Friedrich E., et al
Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Westliche 24
D-75172 Pforzheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/11]Mayer, Friedrich, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Westliche 24
D-75172 Pforzheim / DE
Application number, filing date81106660.427.08.1981
[1982/11]
Priority number, dateDE1980303341705.09.1980         Original published format: DE 3033417
[1982/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0047444
Date:17.03.1982
Language:DE
[1982/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0047444
Date:27.06.1984
Language:DE
[1984/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.1981
ClassificationIPC:A01G25/00, B05B3/16
[1982/11]
CPC:
B05B3/044 (EP,US); Y10S239/01 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [1982/11]
TitleGerman:Auf unterschiedliche Beregnungsbedürfnisse variierbarer Regner[1982/11]
English:Variable sprinkler for different irrigation requirements[1982/11]
French:Arroseur modulable en fonction des besoins d'irrigation[1982/11]
Examination procedure25.08.1982Examination requested  [1982/44]
20.09.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
13.12.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.1984Fee for grant paid
25.01.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.03.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE7115718U  [ ];
 DE1926735  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.