blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0050296

EP0050296 - A pulsation-free volumetric pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.1986
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.1986No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.06.1986 [1986/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKKISO CO., LTD.
No. 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1982/17]For all designated states
NIKKISO CO., LTD.
No. 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome
Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Akiba, Takashi
c/o NIKKISO CO., LTD. No. 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome
Shibuya-ku Toyko / JP
[1982/17]
Representative(s)Wilcken, Hugo, et al
Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann Musterbahn 1
23552 Lübeck / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/17]Wilcken, Hugo, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann Musterbahn 1
D-23552 Lübeck / DE
Application number, filing date81108256.913.10.1981
[1982/17]
Priority number, dateJP1980014507418.10.1980         Original published format: JP 14507480
[1982/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0050296
Date:28.04.1982
Language:EN
[1982/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0050296
Date:05.06.1985
Language:EN
[1985/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.1982
ClassificationIPC:F04B49/00
[1982/17]
CPC:
F04B49/20 (EP); F04B11/0058 (EP); F04B2203/0209 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1982/17]
TitleGerman:Pulsationsfreie Messpumpe[1982/17]
English:A pulsation-free volumetric pump[1982/17]
French:Pompe volumétrique sans pulsation[1982/17]
Examination procedure09.09.1982Examination requested  [1982/46]
01.06.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
13.11.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.1985Fee for grant paid
31.01.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.03.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE2737062  [ ];
 DE2759056  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.