blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0054134

EP0054134 - Double axle drive for rail vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.07.1985
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THYSSEN INDUSTRIE AG
Am Thyssenhaus 1
45128 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/25]For all designated states
THYSSEN INDUSTRIE AG
Am Thyssenhaus 1
D-45128 Essen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Piepenbreier, Ernst
Wintgenstrasse 15
D-4300 Essen / DE
[1982/25]
Representative(s)Eberhard, Friedrich
Am Thyssenhaus 1
45128 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/25]Eberhard, Friedrich, Dr.
Am Thyssenhaus 1
D-45128 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date81108686.722.10.1981
[1982/25]
Priority number, dateDE1980304741317.12.1980         Original published format: DE 3047413
[1982/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0054134
Date:23.06.1982
Language:DE
[1982/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.1982
ClassificationIPC:B61C9/50, B61C9/52, B61F3/04
[1982/25]
CPC:
B61C9/50 (EP); B61C9/52 (EP); B61F3/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1982/25]
TitleGerman:Doppelachsantrieb für Schienenfahrzeuge[1982/25]
English:Double axle drive for rail vehicles[1982/25]
French:Dispositif de traction à deux axes pour véhicules sur rails[1982/25]
File destroyed:13.07.1991
Examination procedure09.07.1982Examination requested  [1982/37]
29.07.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.12.1984Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1985/40]
31.01.1985Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1985/40]
Request for further processing for:04.04.1985Request for further processing filed
03.04.1985Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request rejected
09.05.1985Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE2325787  [ ];
 FR684497  [ ];
 CH126707  [ ];
 DE2616310  [ ];
 DE2910392  [ ];
 DE2548058  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.