EP0051309 - Window [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.10.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aug. Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Strasse 48291 Telgte / DE | [2000/49] |
Former [1991/28] | For all designated states Aug. Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Strasse D-48291 Telgte / DE | ||
Former [1982/19] | For all designated states Firma Aug. Winkhaus August-Winkhaus-Strasse 78 D-4404 Telgte / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beyer, Rudolf Einener Strasse 67 D-4404 Telgte / DE | 02 /
Mayer, Siegfried An der Vogelrute 10 D-4400 Münster Wolbeck / DE | 03 /
Vosskötter, Alfred Brüderstrasse 2 D-4400 Münster / DE | 04 /
Greisner, Paul Bernsmeyerweg 22 D-4404 Telgte / DE | [1982/19] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/19] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Weickmann Dipl.-Phys.Dr. K. Fincke Dipl.-Ing. F.A. Weickmann Dipl.-Chem. B. Huber Dr.-Ing. H. Liska M hlstrasse 22 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81109419.2 | 30.10.1981 | [1982/19] | Priority number, date | DE19803041399 | 03.11.1980 Original published format: DE 3041399 | DE19803043926 | 21.11.1980 Original published format: DE 3043926 | DE19813111347 | 23.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3111347 | DE19813111579 | 24.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3111579 | DE19813120940 | 26.05.1981 Original published format: DE 3120940 | DE19813120941 | 26.05.1981 Original published format: DE 3120941 | DE19813127833 | 14.07.1981 Original published format: DE 3127833 | [1982/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0051309 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0051309 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051309 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0051309 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/52, E05D15/526 | [1985/26] | CPC: |
E05B15/021 (EP);
E05C9/066 (EP);
E05C9/24 (EP);
E05D15/52 (EP);
E05D15/526 (EP);
E05C17/24 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1982/44] | E05D15/52, E05D15/526 | ||
Former IPC [1982/19] | E05D15/526 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [1982/19] | Title | German: | Fenster | [1982/19] | English: | Window | [1982/19] | French: | Fenêtre | [1982/19] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 14.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.06.1992
27.08.1992
ADMISSIBLE SIEGENIA-FRANK KG Postfach 10 05 51 D-57005 Siegen / DE Opponent's representative Müller, Gerd Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | 02
16.06.1992
27.08.1992
ADMISSIBLE Roto Frank AG Postfach 10 01 58 D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE Opponent's representative Schmid, Berthold Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.06.1992
27.08.1992
ADMISSIBLE SIEGENIA-FRANK KG Postfach 10 05 51 D-57005 Siegen / DE Opponent's representative Müller, Gerd Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
02
16.06.1992
27.08.1992
ADMISSIBLE Roto Frank AG Postfach 10 01 58 D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE Opponent's representative Schmid, Berthold, Dipl.-Ing. Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1994/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.06.1992
27.08.1992
ADMISSIBLE SIEGENIA-FRANK KG Postfach 10 05 51 D-57005 Siegen / DE | ||
02
16.06.1992
27.08.1992
ADMISSIBLE Roto Frank AG Postfach 10 01 58 D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE Opponent's representative Schmid, Berthold, Dipl.-Ing. Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1992/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.06.1992
SIEGENIA-FRANK KG Postfach 10 05 51 D-57005 Siegen / DE | ||
02
16.06.1992
Roto Frank AG Postfach 10 01 58 D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 02.09.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.03.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.03.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 28.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.03.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.05.1996 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.04.2000 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.10.2000 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 22.06.1996 | Appeal received No. T0573/96 | 16.09.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.03.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 11.05.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.05.1999 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.09.1991 | CH | 31.10.1996 | LI | 31.10.1996 | SE | 31.10.1996 | [2006/32] |
Former [2001/16] | CH | 31.10.1996 | |
LI | 31.10.1996 | ||
SE | 31.10.1996 | ||
FR | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [1998/11] | CH | 31.10.1996 | |
LI | 31.10.1996 | ||
SE | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | CH | 31.10.1996 | |
LI | 31.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1459151 (JAEGER KG FRANK); | [E]DE3022163 (WEIDTMANN WILHELM KG [DE]); | [A]DE1584117 (JAEGER KG FRANK); | [A]DE2750073 (SCHUERMANN & CO HEINZ); | [X]DE1708430 (VER BAUBESCHLAG GRETSCH CO); | [X]DE2907891 (SCHUERMANN & CO HEINZ); | [Y]FR2441039 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]); | [X]DE2451556 (SIEGENIA FRANK KG); | [Y]DE1907685 (FRANK GMBH WILH); | [A]DE1804484 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST); | [A]DE164053 ; | [Y]NL7217335 |