blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0055831

EP0055831 - Device for feeding powder materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.09.1986
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.1986No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.11.1986 [1986/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IBAU HAMBURG Ingenieurgesellschaft Industriebau mbH
Amsinckstrasse 45
D-2000 Hamburg 1 / DE
[1982/28]
Inventor(s)01 / Delfs, Hans-Jürgen
Kahden 35
D-2000 Hamburg 65 / DE
[1982/28]
Representative(s)von Raffay, Vincenz, et al
Patentanwälte Raffay & Fleck Geffckenstrasse 6
20249 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/04]von Raffay, Vincenz, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Raffay, Fleck & Partner Postfach 32 32 17
D-20117 Hamburg / DE
Former [1982/28]von Raffay, Vincenz, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Raffay, Fleck & Partner Postfach 32 32 17
D-2000 Hamburg 13 / DE
Application number, filing date81110136.904.12.1981
[1982/28]
Priority number, dateDE1981310005002.01.1981         Original published format: DE 3100050
[1982/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0055831
Date:14.07.1982
Language:DE
[1982/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0055831
Date:21.11.1985
Language:DE
[1985/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.1982
ClassificationIPC:B65G53/08, B65G53/48
[1982/28]
CPC:
B65G33/24 (EP,US); B65G53/48 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1982/28]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Einschleusen von pulverförmigem Gut[1982/28]
English:Device for feeding powder materials[1982/28]
French:Dispositif pour introduire des matériaux pulvérulents[1982/28]
Examination procedure14.07.1982Examination requested  [1982/38]
11.01.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.09.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
06.05.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.1985Fee for grant paid
08.07.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.08.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE2507687  [ ];
 DE2729863  [ ] (STABILATOR AB);
 DE1249763  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.