Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0056874

EP0056874 - Apparatus for cutting paper and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  22.10.1992
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mohr, Rolf
Hattersheimer Strasse 15
D-6238 Hofheim (Taunus) / DE
For all designated states
Mohr, Wolfgang
Hundshager Weg 42
D-65719 Hofheim / DE
[1989/38]
Former [1982/31]For all designated states
Mohr, Karl
Hattersheimer Strasse 11
D-6238 Hofheim / DE
For all designated states
Mohr, Wolfgang
Hundshager Weg 42
D-65719 Hofheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1982/31]
Representative(s)Quermann, Helmut
Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unter den Eichen 5
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/20]Quermann, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Postfach 61 45
D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [1986/33](deleted)
...
Former [1982/31]Röbe-Oltmanns, Georg, Dr.
Dotzheimer Strasse 61
D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date81110792.928.12.1981
[1982/31]
Priority number, dateDE1981310191122.01.1981         Original published format: DE 3101911
[1982/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0056874
Date:04.08.1982
Language:DE
[1982/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0056874
Date:15.06.1983
Language:DE
[1983/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0056874
Date:09.10.1985
Language:DE
[1985/41]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0056874
Date:09.12.1992
Language:DE
[1992/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.1983
ClassificationInternational:B26D7/18
[1982/31]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1982/31]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Schneiden von Papier, Pappe oder dgl[1982/31]
English:Apparatus for cutting paper and the like[1982/31]
French:Machine pour couper le papier etc.[1982/31]
Examination procedure24.08.1983Examination requested  [1983/45]
01.08.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
21.03.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.1985Fee for grant paid
12.06.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.07.1986  03.09.1986  ADMISSIBLE
VEB Kombinat Polygraph "Werner Lamberz"
Patentbüro Postfach 14 34
D-04332 Leipzig / DE
Opponent's representative
Beetz jr., Richard, et al
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
 02  08.07.1986  31.07.1986  ADMISSIBLE
H. Wohlenberg KG GmbH & Co
Wohlenberg Strasse 6-8
D-3000 Hannover / DE
Opponent's representative
Thömen, Uwe
Patentanwalt U. Thömen Zeppelinstrasse 5
30175 Hannover / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1986/38]
Opponent(s)01  04.07.1986  03.09.1986  ADMISSIBLE
VEB Kombinat Polygraph "Werner Lamberz"
Patentbüro Postfach 14 34
D-04332 Leipzig / DE
Opponent's representative
Beetz, Richard Jr., Dr.-Ing., et al
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-80538 München / DE
 02  08.07.1986  31.07.1986  ADMISSIBLE
H. Wohlenberg KG GmbH & Co
Wohlenberg Strasse 6-8
D-3000 Hannover / DE
Opponent's representative
Thömen, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt U. Thömen Zeppelinstrasse 5
D-30175 Hannover / DE
Former [1986/35]
Opponent(s)01  04.07.1986  03.09.1986  ADMISSIBLE
VEB Kombinat Polygraph "Werner Lamberz"
Patentbüro Postfach 14 34
D-04332 Leipzig / DE
Opponent's representative
Beetz, Richard Jr., Dr.-Ing., et al
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-80538 München / DE
05.09.1986Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.10.1986Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.11.1986Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M05)
26.03.1987Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
05.04.1988Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05)
18.08.1988Reply to a communication from the opposition division
28.05.1990Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.04.1992Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.07.1992Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
01.10.1992Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition03.07.1990Appeal received No.  T0530/90
24.09.1990Statement of grounds filed
23.04.1992Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
23.04.1992Date of oral proceedings
06.05.1992Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Stay/Interruption18.10.1988Interruption of proceedings, reason: applicant died[1989/05]
02.06.1989Resumption of proceedings[1989/19]
18.10.1988Interruption of proceedings, reason: applicant died[1989/19]
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1195577  ;
 [A]FR1150136  ;
 [X]DE479013  ;
 [A]DE491788  ;
 [A]DE1242560  ;
 [A]DE1627314