Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0056874 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0056874



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 933
04.11.1992 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
29.10.1992 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 2
29.10.1992 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 2
29.10.1992 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 2
01.10.1992 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
01.10.1992 Translation of the claims Opposition 5
01.10.1992 Translation of the claims Opposition 5
24.07.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 9
24.07.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 8
24.07.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
24.07.1992 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
24.07.1992 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
17.07.1992 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
15.07.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.07.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.07.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.05.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.05.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.05.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.04.1992 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
23.04.1992 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
18.04.1992 Annex Appeal 6
18.04.1992 Annex Appeal 9
18.04.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
16.04.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
18.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.03.1992 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.03.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.03.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.03.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.03.1992 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
12.03.1992 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
12.03.1992 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
11.03.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.03.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.02.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.02.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.11.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.11.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.11.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.11.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
11.11.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
11.11.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
17.07.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.07.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
17.04.1991 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
17.04.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.04.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
09.03.1991 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
21.02.1991 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
21.02.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.02.1991 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
14.02.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.02.1991 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
08.02.1991 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
06.02.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.01.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.01.1991 Annex Appeal 3
18.01.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
05.10.1990 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.10.1990 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.10.1990 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.10.1990 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.09.1990 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
24.09.1990 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 21
07.08.1990 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.08.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.08.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.1990 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.07.1990 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
24.07.1990 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.07.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
03.07.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.07.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
03.07.1990 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.06.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.05.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.05.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.05.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
28.05.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
28.05.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
28.05.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
28.05.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
28.05.1990 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
28.05.1990 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 12
28.05.1990 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.05.1990 Means of redress Opposition 1
28.05.1990 Text intended for grant Opposition 23
18.05.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.05.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.05.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.04.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
27.04.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 9
27.04.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
27.04.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
27.04.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
27.04.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
27.04.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
27.04.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 7
27.04.1990 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
27.04.1990 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
27.04.1990 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
27.04.1990 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.1990 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.1990 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.12.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.12.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.12.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.12.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.12.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.12.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
14.12.1989 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
14.12.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
14.12.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
25.11.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.11.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.11.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.11.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.1989 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.1989 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.10.1989 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.09.1989 Communication about missing advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.09.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.08.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.08.1989 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.07.1989 Drawings Opposition 1
25.07.1989 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 9
28.06.1989 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.05.1989 Claims Opposition 2
30.05.1989 Drawings Opposition 2
30.05.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
22.03.1989 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.03.1989 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.03.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 4
20.03.1989 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
03.03.1989 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
03.03.1989 Request for assignment Search / examination 13
21.12.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
21.12.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
21.12.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
12.11.1988 General enquiry Search / examination 2
11.11.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
11.11.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
11.11.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
11.11.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
03.11.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.11.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.11.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.10.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
05.10.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.10.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.09.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
29.08.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.08.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.08.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.08.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.08.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
18.08.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.08.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
17.08.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 14
16.08.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
10.08.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.08.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.06.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.06.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.06.1988 Claims Opposition 3
03.06.1988 Description Opposition 4
03.06.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
15.04.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.04.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
05.04.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
30.03.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
30.03.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.12.1987 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
06.11.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.10.1987 Drawings Opposition 1
24.10.1987 Drawings Opposition 1
24.10.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
24.10.1987 Statement of grounds Opposition 14
29.09.1987 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.09.1987 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.08.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 14
08.07.1987 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.06.1987 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.05.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.05.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.05.1987 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.05.1987 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.05.1987 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.03.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
30.03.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
27.03.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
27.03.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
27.03.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.03.1987 Annex Opposition 1
26.03.1987 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.03.1987 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 2
26.03.1987 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 28
20.03.1987 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.03.1987 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
18.03.1987 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.02.1987 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.11.1986 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 2
16.10.1986 Claims Opposition 2
16.10.1986 Description Opposition 3
16.10.1986 Drawings Opposition 3
16.10.1986 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 22
19.09.1986 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.09.1986 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.09.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.09.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.09.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.09.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.08.1986 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
11.08.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.07.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.07.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.07.1986 N/A Opposition 1
12.07.1986 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
12.07.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.07.1986 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
11.07.1986 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.07.1986 Annex Opposition 1
08.07.1986 Drawings Opposition 6
08.07.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
08.07.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.07.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
08.07.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
08.07.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 26
05.07.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.07.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
15.10.1985 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 3
14.08.1985 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.07.1985 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 5
13.07.1985 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.07.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
03.07.1985 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
25.06.1985 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
03.05.1985 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.05.1985 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
03.05.1985 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
24.04.1985 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
26.03.1985 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 2
21.03.1985 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
20.03.1985 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
20.03.1985 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
14.03.1985 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.02.1985 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.02.1985 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
06.02.1985 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
07.11.1984 Claims Search / examination 5
07.11.1984 Description Search / examination 7
07.11.1984 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.08.1984 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.06.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
16.05.1984 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
24.08.1983 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
21.06.1983 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
13.04.1983 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.04.1983 European search report Search / examination 2
25.03.1983 General enquiry Search / examination 1
05.11.1982 General enquiry Search / examination 1
09.06.1982 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
23.01.1982 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
23.01.1982 Priority document Search / examination 24
28.12.1981 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.12.1981 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
28.12.1981 Claims Search / examination 4
28.12.1981 Description Search / examination 20
28.12.1981 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.12.1981 Drawings Search / examination 8
28.12.1981 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.12.1981 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8