blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0033564

EP0033564 - A device for recording and handling of information regarding time and activities [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1981/32]A method and a device for recording and handling of information regarding time and activities
[1989/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.1989
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.10.2007  [2007/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dag Bille Svensk Idéutveckling AB
Gäsevadholm Pl. 7240
S-434 00 Kungsbacka / SE
[1981/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Dag, Bille
Gäsevadholm Pl. 7240
S-434 00 Kungsbacka / SE
[1981/32]
Representative(s)Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al
Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4
417 64 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [1981/32]Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al
GÖTEBORGS PATENTBYRA AB Box 5005
S-402 21 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date81200076.826.01.1981
[1981/32]
Priority number, dateSE1980000059025.01.1980         Original published format: SE 8000590
[1981/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0033564
Date:12.08.1981
Language:EN
[1981/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0033564
Date:19.08.1981
Language:EN
[1981/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0033564
Date:25.01.1989
Language:EN
[1989/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.1981
ClassificationIPC:G07C3/00
[1981/32]
CPC:
G07C3/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1981/32]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Aufzeichnen und Verarbeiten von Zeitabschnitten und Vorgänge betreffenden Daten[1989/04]
English:A device for recording and handling of information regarding time and activities[1989/04]
French:Dispositif pour l'enregistrement et le traitement d'informations concernant des durées et des fonctions[1989/04]
Former [1981/32]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufzeichnen und Verarbeiten von Zeitabschnitten und Vorgänge betreffende Daten
Former [1981/32]A method and a device for recording and handling of information regarding time and activities
Former [1981/32]Procédé et dispositif pour l'enregistrement et le traitement d'informations concernant des durées et des fonctions
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure08.02.1982Examination requested  [1982/16]
25.08.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.07.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.1988Fee for grant paid
14.10.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.10.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1990/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.1986Renewal fee patent year 06
06.02.1987Renewal fee patent year 07
29.01.1988Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.198707   M06   Fee paid on   06.02.1987
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.01.1989
BE25.01.1989
CH25.01.1989
FR25.01.1989
IT25.01.1989
LI25.01.1989
NL25.01.1989
GB25.03.1989
DE03.10.1989
[2002/24]
Former [1999/42]AT25.01.1989
BE25.01.1989
CH25.01.1989
IT25.01.1989
LI25.01.1989
NL25.01.1989
GB25.03.1989
DE03.10.1989
Former [1990/24]AT25.01.1989
CH25.01.1989
LI25.01.1989
NL25.01.1989
BE31.01.1989
GB25.03.1989
DE03.10.1989
Former [1990/04]AT25.01.1989
CH25.01.1989
LI25.01.1989
NL25.01.1989
BE31.01.1989
GB25.03.1989
Former [1990/01]AT25.01.1989
NL25.01.1989
BE31.01.1989
Former [1989/47]AT25.01.1989
BE31.01.1989
Former [1989/39]BE31.01.1989
Documents cited:SearchDE2822435  [ ] (AGRARTUDOMANYI EGYETEM)
    [ ] - MACHINERY AND PRODUCTION ENGINEERING, Vol. 126, 12-03-1975, London, GB G.E. PURNELL: "Shop floor data acquisition and communication", pages 240-245.
    [ ] - CONTROL ENGINEERING; Vol. 19, 02-1972 New York, USA R.L. ARONSON: "Production monitoring systems: A hardware survey", pages 23-27.
ExaminationFR2087697
 DE2208017
 FR2222921
 DE2437505
 US3987432
 DE2638349
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.