blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0035308

EP0035308 - Wind direction indicator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.1986
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kuipers, Pieter Geert
Amerikalaan 50
NL-5691 KE SON / NL
[1981/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1981/36]
Application number, filing date81200216.024.02.1981
[1981/36]
Priority number, dateNL1980000133605.03.1980         Original published format: NL 8001336
[1981/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0035308
Date:09.09.1981
Language:EN
[1981/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0035308
Date:21.04.1982
Language:EN
[1982/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0035308
Date:28.08.1985
Language:EN
[1985/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.1982
ClassificationIPC:G01P13/02
[1981/36]
CPC:
G01P13/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1981/36]
TitleGerman:Windrichtungsanzeiger[1981/36]
English:Wind direction indicator[1981/36]
French:Indicateur de direction du vent[1981/36]
File destroyed:05.09.1996
Examination procedure06.09.1982Examination requested  [1982/46]
22.03.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
14.02.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.1985Fee for grant paid
14.05.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.05.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.03.198303   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.1983
01.03.198404   M06   Fee paid on   07.08.1984
28.02.198505   M06   Fee paid on   18.04.1985
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Former [1989/27]GB24.02.1986
Documents cited:SearchDE190519  [ ];
 [A]CH613282  ;
 [A]DE2157950  ;
 [A]US3277706  ;
 [A]US3572116
 [A]  - Radio & Electronic Engineer, Vol. 43, No. 12, December 1973 London, GB J. ELLIOT "The Computation of the Best Windward and Running Courses for Sailing Yachts" pages 715-719.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.