Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0035332

EP0035332 - Ceramic tile adhesives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  16.09.1992
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.09.2009  [2009/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCOTT BADER COMPANY LIMITED
Wollaston Wellingborough
Northamptonshire NN9 7RL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1981/36]For all designated states
SCOTT BADER COMPANY LIMITED
Wollaston
Wellingborough Northamptonshire NN9 7RL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Sauntson, Barry John
71 Wharf Road
Higham Ferrers Northants / GB
[1981/36]
Representative(s)Harrison, David Christopher , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Harrison, David Christopher , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [1981/36]Harrison, David Christopher , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date81300550.111.02.1981
[1981/36]
Priority number, dateGB1980000709203.03.1980         Original published format: GB 8007092
[1981/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0035332
Date:09.09.1981
Language:EN
[1981/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0035332
Date:31.03.1982
Language:EN
[1982/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0035332
Date:26.09.1984
Language:EN
[1984/39]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0035332
Date:04.11.1992
Language:EN
[1992/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.1982
ClassificationInternational:C09J4/02, C08L33/06, C08L25/04, C08L51/00, C08F265/04
[1992/45]
Former International [1981/36]C09J3/00, C08L33/06, C08L25/04, C08L51/00, C08F265/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [1984/39]
Former [1981/36]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT 
TitleGerman:Klebstoffe für keramische Fliesen[1981/36]
English:Ceramic tile adhesives[1981/36]
French:Adhésifs pour carreaux en céramique[1981/36]
Examination procedure23.03.1982Examination requested  [1982/23]
02.08.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
23.02.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.1984Fee for grant paid
11.05.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.05.1985  04.06.1985  ADMISSIBLE
WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH
Hans-Seidel-Platz 4
D-81737 München / DE
 02  22.06.1985  30.07.1985  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 03  22.06.1985  30.07.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Naamloze Vennootschap DSM
Het Overloon 1
NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
Leherte, Georges M.L.M.
Octrooibureau DSM
P.O. Box 9
6160 MA Geleen / NL
 [N/P]
Former [1985/37]
Opponent(s)01  03.05.1985  04.06.1985  ADMISSIBLE
WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH
Hans-Seidel-Platz 4
D-81737 München / DE
 02  22.06.1985  30.07.1985  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 03  22.06.1985  30.07.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Naamloze Vennootschap DSM
Het Overloon 1
NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
Leherte, Georges Maurice Lucien Marie
Octrooibureau DSM P.O.Box 9
NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL
Former [1985/36]
Opponent(s)01  03.05.1985  04.06.1985  ADMISSIBLE
WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH
Hans-Seidel-Platz 4
D-81737 München / DE
 02  22.06.1985  30.07.1985  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1985/28]
Opponent(s)01  03.05.1985  04.06.1985  ADMISSIBLE
WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH
Hans-Seidel-Platz 4
D-81737 München / DE
31.07.1985Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.12.1985Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.01.1986Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
05.03.1986Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
18.06.1986Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.1986Reply to a communication from the opposition division
04.08.1987Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
23.11.1990Date of oral proceedings
27.11.1990Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.06.1991Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.1991Reply to a communication from the opposition division
10.10.1991Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.10.1991Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.02.1992Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
16.04.1992Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition02.10.1987Appeal received No.  T0332/87
02.10.1987Statement of grounds filed
23.11.1990Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]FR1534183  ;
 [AD]GB1407827  ;
 [A]FR2218351