blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0035405

EP0035405 - Automated cleaning system for dialyzers and a method of cleaning dialyzers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.11.1982
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNITED HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATION, INC.
3961 MacArthur Blvd., Suite 212 Newport Beach
California 92660 / US
[N/P]
Former [1981/36]For all designated states
UNITED HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATION, INC.
3961 MacArthur Blvd., Suite 212
Newport Beach California 92660 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gortz, Norman
4985 Paseo de Vega
Irvine California 92715 / US
02 / Huson, Andrew S.
13841 E. Tustin Drive
Tustin California 92680 / US
03 / MacIntyre, Robert M.
2421 E. Ball Road
Anaheim California 92806 / US
[1981/36]
Representative(s)Ranson, Arthur Terence, et al
W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1981/36]Ranson, Arthur Terence, et al
W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date81300866.103.03.1981
[1981/36]
Priority number, dateUS1980012652203.03.1980         Original published format: US 126522
[1981/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0035405
Date:09.09.1981
Language:EN
[1981/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0035405
Date:25.11.1981
Language:EN
[1981/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.1981
ClassificationIPC:A61M1/03
[1981/36]
CPC:
B01D65/022 (EP,US); A61M1/168 (EP,US); A61M1/1682 (EP,US);
A61M1/1684 (EP,US); A61M1/169 (EP,US); A61M1/3643 (EP,US);
A61M1/3644 (EP,US); A61M1/3649 (EP,US); A61M1/365 (EP,US);
B01D2321/40 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1981/36]
TitleGerman:Automatisches Dialysatoren-Reinigungs-System und Dialysatoren-Reinigungs-Verfahren[1981/36]
English:Automated cleaning system for dialyzers and a method of cleaning dialyzers[1981/36]
French:Système automatique pour nettoyer des dialyseurs et méthode[1981/36]
File destroyed:19.02.1989
Examination procedure20.08.1982Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1983/05]
31.10.1982Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1983/05]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchUS3441136  [ ] (SERFASS EARL J, et al);
 US3946731  [ ] (LICHTENSTEIN ERIC S);
 FR2294716  [ ] (LANGUEDOC MEDITER CTRE HEMODIA [FR]);
 US3992301  [ ] (SHIPPEY FRANK R, et al);
 US4113614  [ ] (ROLLO ANITA HAND, et al);
 US4153554  [ ] (VON DER HEIDE JACK, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.