blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0051347


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.09.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.10.2007  [2007/44]
02.07.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.08.2004  [2004/34]
03.09.1999 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.10.1999 [1999/42]
27.04.1988 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.1988 [1988/24]
08.12.1987 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.01.1988 [1988/04]
09.12.1986 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.01.1987 [1987/05]
13.12.1985 (Expected) grant published on  12.02.1986 [1986/07]
02.12.1982 Publication of search report published on  02.02.1983 [1983/05]
11.11.1982 Change - classification published on  12.01.1983 [1983/02]
14.09.1982 Change - representative published on  17.11.1982 [1982/46]
08.09.1982 Change - applicant published on  10.11.1982 [1982/45]
08.09.1982 Change - representative published on  10.11.1982 [1982/45]
12.03.1982 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.05.1982 [1982/19]
12.03.1982 Request for examination filed published on  12.05.1982 [1982/19]