blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0051347
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0051347Global Dossier 12.02.1986B1
EP0051347 02.02.1983A3
EP0051347 12.05.1982A2
Priority number Date
US20012880 24.10.1980
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU545887B 08.08.1985B2
AU6940581 29.04.1982A
Priority number Date
US20012880 24.10.1980
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR8102574 17.08.1982A
Priority number Date
US20012880 24.10.1980
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA1161199 24.01.1984A
Priority number Date
US20012880 24.10.1980
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE3173756D 27.03.1986D1
Priority number Date
US20012880 24.10.1980
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES8207562 16.09.1982A1
Priority number Date
US20012880 24.10.1980
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GR75224 13.07.1984B
Priority number Date
US20012880 24.10.1980
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPS5776022 12.05.1982A
Priority number Date
US20012880 24.10.1980
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NZ196972 17.06.1983A
Priority number Date
US20012880 24.10.1980
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US4374207 15.02.1983A
Priority number Date
US20012880 24.10.1980
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA8102283 28.04.1982B
Priority number Date
US20012880 24.10.1980