blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0051347

Designated contracting states BELapse: 12.02.1986
 DE 
FRLapse: 12.02.1986
GB 
 ITLapse: 12.02.1986
 NLLapse: 12.02.1986
Examination procedure23.08.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted12.02.1986
Opposition procedure13.11.1986No opposition filed within time limit published on 28.01.1987 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.05.1982 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:12.05.1982 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19811030
 
Event date:10.11.1982 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:G.F.C. FOAM CORPORATION
 
Event date:02.02.1983 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:12.02.1986 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Effective DATE:19860212
 
Event date:12.02.1986 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:19860212
 
Event date:12.02.1986 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:19860212
 
Event date:12.02.1986 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Effective DATE:19860212
 
Event date:12.02.1986 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:27.03.1986 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:3173756
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19860327
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:04.07.1986 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED
 
Event date:16.07.1986 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT
 
Event date:28.01.1987 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:30.04.1991 
Event description:IT: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE
 
Event date:18.03.1992 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:19920318
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:23.03.1992 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:19920323
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:30.06.1992 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:19920630
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:22.04.1993 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Effective DATE:19930422
 
Event date:22.12.1993 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:19930422
 
Event date:01.01.1994 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Effective DATE:19940101