Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0051347

EP0051347 - Intumescent flexible polyurethane foam and process of manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.12.1986
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.10.2007  [2007/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.F.C. FOAM CORPORATION
West 100 Century Road Paramus
New Jersey 07652 / US
[N/P]
Former [1982/45]For all designated states
G.F.C. FOAM CORPORATION
West 100 Century Road
Paramus New Jersey 07652 / US
Former [1982/19]For all designated states
TENNECO CHEMICALS INC
Park 80 Plaza West-1
Saddle Brook, New Jersey 07662 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Stone, Herman
1330 Roberts Avenue
Hazleton Pennsylvania / US
02 / Pauly, Peter Daniel
4 Terrace Drive
Mountaintop Pennsylvania / US
03 / Pcolinsky, Michael P. Jr.
1009 Meade Court
Hazleton Pennsylvania / US
[1982/19]
Representative(s)Oliver, Roy Edward , et al
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1982/19]Oliver, Roy Edward , et al
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Application number, filing date81301782.922.04.1981
[1982/19]
Priority number, dateUS1980020012824.10.1980         Original published format: US 200128
[1982/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0051347
Date:12.05.1982
Language:EN
[1982/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0051347
Date:02.02.1983
Language:EN
[1983/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0051347
Date:12.02.1986
Language:EN
[1986/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1982
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/40, C08G18/38, C08G18/32, C08K5/52, C08K3/22, C08K5/02, C08L75/04, C08G18/63, C08G18/76, C08J9/00
[1983/02]
Former International [1982/19]C08G18/40, C08G18/38, C08G18/32, C08K5/52, C08K3/22, C08K5/02, C08L75/04, C08G18/63, C08G18/76
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1982/19]
TitleGerman:Intumeszierender weicher Polyurethanschaumstoff und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[1982/19]
English:Intumescent flexible polyurethane foam and process of manufacture thereof[1982/19]
French:Mousse de polyuréthane flexible, intumescente, et procédé pour sa fabrication[1982/19]
Examination procedure30.10.1981Examination requested  [1982/19]
24.09.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
30.07.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.1985Fee for grant paid
23.08.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.11.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1987/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE12.02.1986
FR12.02.1986
IT12.02.1986
NL12.02.1986
[2004/34]
Former [1999/42]BE12.02.1986
IT12.02.1986
NL12.02.1986
Former [1988/24]BE12.02.1986
NL12.02.1986
Former [1988/04]BE12.02.1986
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4139501  (RUDNER BERNARD, et al);
 [AP]GB2051083  (HENDERSONS IND LTD);
 [AD]US4042537  (DAHM MANFRED, et al);
 [A]DE2809084  (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD);
 [A]DE2542499  (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND);
 [A]DE1694560  (LICENTIA GMBH);
 [A]FR2390471  (UNIROYAL INC [US])
 [T]  - JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PLASTICS, Vol. 17, No. 4, July-August 1981, Westport. P.V. BONSIGNORE: "Aluminia Trihydrate as a Flame Retardant For Polyurethane Foams", pages 220 to 225,
Examination   - SZABAT, J.F. U. W.J. EICHER, PROC. S.P.I. ANNU. URethane Div. Tech. Conf. Polyurethane foams, 1979, 82-96,