blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0065041

EP0065041 - Parallel arm windscreen wiper with through-the-pane drive [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  01.12.1990
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[N/P]
Former [1982/47]For all designated states
DEERE & COMPANY
1 John Deere Road
Moline, Illinois 61265 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hauk, Klaus
Berlinerstrasse 28
D-6701 Altrip / DE
[1982/47]
Representative(s)Pears, David Ashley, et al
REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
[1982/47]
Application number, filing date81302130.013.05.1981
[1982/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0065041
Date:24.11.1982
Language:EN
[1982/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0065041
Date:06.03.1985
Language:EN
[1985/10]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0065041
Date:16.01.1991
Language:EN
[1991/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.1981
ClassificationIPC:B60S1/34
[1982/47]
CPC:
B60S1/3404 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1983/03]
Former [1982/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Windschutzscheibenwischer mit parallelen Armen und die Scheibe durchdringendem Antrieb[1982/47]
English:Parallel arm windscreen wiper with through-the-pane drive[1982/47]
French:Essuie-glace ayant des bras parallèles et un entraînement à travers le pare-brise[1982/47]
Examination procedure05.04.1982Examination requested  [1982/47]
06.08.1982Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, LU, NL
17.10.1982Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.05.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
14.08.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.1984Fee for grant paid
24.10.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.12.1985  20.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
SWF Auto-Electric GmbH
Stuttgarter Strasse 119 Postfach 1763
D-74307 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
 02  05.12.1985  28.02.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Ing. h. c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft
Porschestrasse Postfach 11 40
D-71283 Weissach / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1986/11]
Opponent(s)01  04.12.1985  20.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
SWF Auto-Electric GmbH
Stuttgarter Strasse 119 Postfach 1763
D-74307 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
 02  05.12.1985  28.02.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Ing. h. c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft
Porschestrasse Postfach 11 40
D-71283 Weissach / DE
Former [1986/07]
Opponent(s)01  04.12.1985  20.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
SWF Auto-Electric GmbH
Stuttgarter Strasse 119 Postfach 1763
D-74307 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
21.01.1986No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
31.01.1986No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
04.03.1986Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.06.1986Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.07.1986Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
01.12.1986Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
09.09.1988Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
06.03.1990Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.04.1990Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.07.1990Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
16.08.1990Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition31.10.1988Appeal received No.  T0545/88
29.12.1988Statement of grounds filed
25.09.1989Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1989/39]
22.11.1989Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1989/47]
06.03.1990Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.05.1982BE   M02   Not yet paid
13.05.1982CH   M02   Not yet paid
13.05.1982LU   M02   Not yet paid
13.05.1982NL   M02   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE1031660  [ ];
 CH244749  [ ] (BAUMGARTNER HANS [CH]);
 GB1234040  [ ];
 US3893204  [ ] (KOLB ERICH)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.