blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0041351

EP0041351 - Modular data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.1990
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.12.1990 [1990/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas, Texas 75265 / US
[N/P]
Former [1981/49]For all designated states
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas Texas 75265 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Tubbs, Graham S.
9445 Concourse 258
Houston Texas / US
02 / Teza, Jeffrey R.
7313 Cook Road
Houston Texas / US
03 / Hull, Charles G.
1923 Klauke Court Rosenberg
Texas / US
04 / Lou, Perry W.
9020 Wilcrest
Houston Texas / US
05 / Hunter, Arthur C.
5717 80th Street
Lubbock Texas / US
06 / Brantingham, George L.
4401 80th Street
Lubbock Texas / US
07 / Graber, Warren S.
1438 Desmond
St. Joseph Michigan / US
08 / Someshwar, Ashok H.
4505 Small Drive
Austin Texas / US
09 / Lies, Kenneth A.
2703 53rd Street
Lubbock Texas / US
10 / Housey, Lawrence J.
2403 Silver Holly
Richardson Texas / US
[1981/49]
Representative(s)Abbott, David John, et al
Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1981/49]Abbott, David John, et al
Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London, WC1V 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date81302300.926.05.1981
[1981/49]
Priority number, dateUS1980015433529.05.1980         Original published format: US 154335
US1980015433929.05.1980         Original published format: US 154339
US1980015434229.05.1980         Original published format: US 154342
US1980015455429.05.1980         Original published format: US 154554
US1980015456029.05.1980         Original published format: US 154560
US1980015471030.05.1980         Original published format: US 154710
US1980015472829.05.1980         Original published format: US 154728
[1981/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0041351
Date:09.12.1981
Language:EN
[1981/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0041351
Date:15.01.1986
Language:EN
[1986/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0041351
Date:20.12.1989
Language:EN
[1989/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.1985
ClassificationIPC:H01L27/02, G06F15/06
[1981/49]
CPC:
G06F15/7867 (EP); G06F12/063 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1981/49]
TitleGerman:Modulares Datenverarbeitungssystem[1989/51]
English:Modular data processing system[1981/49]
French:Système de traitement de données modulaire[1981/49]
Former [1981/49]Datenverarbeitungsbausteinsystem
MiscellaneousEPB 1989/51: Teilanmeldung 89110008.3 eingereicht am 26/05/81
EPB 1989/51: Divisional application 89110008.3 filed on 26/05/81
EPB 1989/51: Demande divisionnaire 89110008.3 déposée le 26/05/81
Examination procedure12.06.1986Examination requested  [1986/33]
19.05.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.12.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.06.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.1989Fee for grant paid
16.08.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP89110008.3  / EP0340804
Opposition(s)21.09.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.1986Renewal fee patent year 06
18.05.1987Renewal fee patent year 07
17.05.1988Renewal fee patent year 08
16.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL20.12.1989
[1990/43]
Documents cited:SearchUS3683415  [ ]
Examination   - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, vol.CE-26, no1, february 1980, pages 81-93, IEEE, New York, US, F.L.TOTH:"Low cost 8-bit single chip microcomputer simplifies software andI/O control in consumer applications"
    - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol.21, no.6, november 1978, pages 2451-2453, New York, US, R.S. CAPOWSKI et al.:"Channel address switching mechanism"
    - BAUTEILE REPORT SIEMENS, vol15, no.5, october 1977, pages 157-163, Munich, DE, H. PELKA:"Umgang mit Mikroprozessoren: Erweiterung des FAN-OUT der Daten- und Adressbusse: 3. Teil"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.