blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0041404

EP0041404 - Herbicidal thiophenesulfonamides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.1985
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.12.1999 [1999/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [1981/49]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Levitt, George
3218 Romilly Road
Wilmington Delaware 19810 / US
[1981/49]
Representative(s)Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1981/49]Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UZ / GB
Application number, filing date81302461.903.06.1981
[1981/49]
Priority number, dateUS1980015327903.06.1980         Original published format: US 153279
US1981025522604.05.1981         Original published format: US 255226
[1981/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0041404
Date:09.12.1981
Language:EN
[1981/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0041404
Date:13.01.1982
Language:EN
[1982/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0041404
Date:30.01.1985
Language:EN
[1985/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.1981
ClassificationIPC:A01N47/36, C07D409/12
[1981/49]
CPC:
C07D521/00 (EP,US); A01N47/36 (EP,US); C07D333/28 (EP,US);
C07D333/34 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [1981/49]
TitleGerman:Thiophensulfonamide mit herbizider Wirkung[1981/49]
English:Herbicidal thiophenesulfonamides[1981/49]
French:Thiophènesulfonamides à activité herbicide[1981/49]
Examination procedure21.04.1982Examination requested  [1982/25]
09.09.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
20.06.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.1984Fee for grant paid
13.09.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.10.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1986/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU30.06.1985
[1999/52]
Documents cited:SearchUS4120691  [ ] (LEVITT GEORGE);
 [X]US4127405  (LEVITT GEORGE);
 EP0001514  [ ] (DU PONT [US]);
 EP0001485  [ ] (DU PONT [US]);
 EP0009419  [ ] (DU PONT [US]);
 EP0010560  [ ] (DU PONT [US]);
 [E]EP0017473  (DU PONT [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.