Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0044676

EP0044676 - Low capacitance airless spray apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  14.07.1995
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORDSON CORPORATION
555 Jackson Street
P. O. Box 151
Amherst
Ohio 44001 / US
[N/P]
Former [1982/04]For all designated states
NORDSON CORPORATION
555 Jackson Street P. O. Box 151
Amherst Ohio 44001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rood, Alvin A.
48344 Rt. 20 RR No. 2
Oberlin Ohio / US
02 / Hastings, Donald R.
42873 Woodhill Drive
Elyria Ohio / US
[1982/04]
Representative(s)Bowman, Paul Alan , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1982/04]Bowman, Paul Alan , et al
LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R OAE / GB
Application number, filing date81303164.810.07.1981
[1982/04]
Priority number, dateUS1980016985017.07.1980         Original published format: US 169850
[1982/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0044676
Date:27.01.1982
Language:EN
[1982/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0044676
Date:30.01.1985
Language:EN
[1985/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.1981
ClassificationInternational:B05B5/02
[1982/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1982/04]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung mit niedriger Kapazitanz zum luftlosen Zerstäuben von Flüssigkeiten[1982/04]
English:Low capacitance airless spray apparatus[1982/04]
French:Appareil de pulvérisation sans air à basse capacitance[1982/04]
Examination procedure05.07.1982Examination requested  [1982/37]
27.10.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
10.07.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.1984Fee for grant paid
29.09.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP83101887.4  / EP0084894
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.10.1985  16.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
ITW Oberflächentechnik GmbH
Justus-von-Liebig-Strasse 31
D-63128 Dietzenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Vetter, Ewald Otto
Patentanwaltsbüro Allgeier & Vetter Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
 02  17.10.1985  05.12.1985  ADMISSIBLE
S.A. SKM
150 Avenue de Stalingrad
F-93240 Stains / FR
Opponent's representative
Lefebure, Gérard
Office Blétry 2, boulevard de Strasbourg
75010 Paris / FR
 03  29.10.1985  16.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Wagner International AG
Industriestrasse 22
9450 Altstätten / CH
Opponent's representative
Liesegang, Roland
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1994/42]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.1985  16.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
ITW Oberflächentechnik GmbH
Justus-von-Liebig-Strasse 31
D-63128 Dietzenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Vetter, Ewald Otto, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Allgeier & Vetter Postfach 10 26 05
D-86016 Augsburg / DE
 02  17.10.1985  05.12.1985  ADMISSIBLE
S.A. SKM
150 Avenue de Stalingrad
F-93240 Stains / FR
Opponent's representative
Lefebure, Gérard
Office Blétry 2, boulevard de Strasbourg
F-75010 Paris / FR
 03  29.10.1985  16.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Wagner International AG
Industriestrasse 22
CH-9450 Altstätten / DE
Opponent's representative
Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing.
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
Former [1993/04]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.1985  16.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Fläkt Ransburg GmbH
Borsigstrasse 9-11
D-63150 Heusenstamm / DE
Opponent's representative
Vetter, Ewald Otto, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Allgeier & Vetter Postfach 10 26 05
D-86016 Augsburg / DE
 02  17.10.1985  05.12.1985  ADMISSIBLE
S.A. SKM
150 Avenue de Stalingrad
F-93240 Stains / FR
Opponent's representative
Lefebure, Gérard
Office Blétry 2, boulevard de Strasbourg
F-75010 Paris / FR
 03  29.10.1985  16.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Wagner International AG
Industriestrasse 22
CH-9450 Altstätten / DE
Opponent's representative
Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing.
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
Former [1993/03]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.1985  16.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Fläkt Ransburg GmbH
Borsigstrasse 9-11
D-63150 Heusenstamm / DE
Opponent's representative
Vetter, Ewald Otto, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Allgeier & Vetter Postfach 10 26 05
D-86016 Augsburg / DE
 02  17.10.1985  05.12.1985  ADMISSIBLE
S.A. SKM
150 Avenue de Stalingrad
F-93240 Stains / FR
Opponent's representative
Lefebure, Gérard
Office Blétry 2, boulevard de Strasbourg
F-75010 Paris / FR
 03  29.10.1985  16.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Wagner International AG
Industriestrasse 22
CH-9450 Altstätten / DE
Former [1986/47]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.1985  16.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Fläkt Ransburg GmbH
Borsigstrasse 9-11
D-63150 Heusenstamm / DE
Opponent's representative
Vetter, Ewald Otto, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Allgeier & Vetter Postfach 10 26 05
D-86016 Augsburg / DE
 02  17.10.1985  05.12.1985  ADMISSIBLE
S.A. SKM
150 Avenue de Stalingrad
F-93240 Stains / FR
Opponent's representative
Lefebure, Gérard
Office Blétry 2, boulevard de Strasbourg
F-75010 Paris / FR
 03  29.10.1985  16.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Wagner International AG
Industriestrasse 22
CH-9450 Altstätten / DE
Opponent's representative
Münzhuber, Robert, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwalt Rumfordstrasse 10
D-80469 München / DE
Former [1986/07]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.1985   
ABB Fläkt Ransburg GmbH
Borsigstrasse 9-11
D-63150 Heusenstamm / DE
Opponent's representative
Vetter, Ewald Otto, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Allgeier & Vetter Postfach 10 26 05
D-86016 Augsburg / DE
 02  17.10.1985   
S.A. SKM
150 Avenue de Stalingrad
F-93240 Stains / FR
Opponent's representative
Lefebure, Gérard
Office Blétry 2, boulevard de Strasbourg
F-75010 Paris / FR
 03  29.10.1985   
Wagner International AG
Industriestrasse 22
CH-9450 Altstätten / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Behn Dipl.-Phys. Robert Münzhuber
Widenmayerstrasse 6/IV
D-8000 München 22 / DE
Former [1985/52]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.1985   
ABB Fläkt Ransburg GmbH
Borsigstrasse 9-11
D-63150 Heusenstamm / DE
Opponent's representative
Vetter, Ewald Otto, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Allgeier & Vetter Postfach 10 26 05
D-86016 Augsburg / DE
 02  17.10.1985   
S.A. SKM
150 Avenue de Stalingrad
F-93240 Stains / FR
Opponent's representative
Lefebure, Gérard
Office Blétry 2, boulevard de Strasbourg
F-75010 Paris / FR
Former [1985/50]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.1985   
ABB Fläkt Ransburg GmbH
Borsigstrasse 9-11
D-63150 Heusenstamm / DE
Opponent's representative
Vetter, Ewald Otto, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Allgeier & Vetter Postfach 10 26 05
D-86016 Augsburg / DE
21.01.1986Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.07.1986Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.08.1986Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
30.10.1986Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
06.10.1988Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01)
13.10.1988Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.01.1989Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.1989Reply to a communication from the opposition division
17.03.1989Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05)
28.08.1989Reply to a communication from the opposition division
02.05.1990Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08)
12.02.1991Reply to a communication from the opposition division
06.07.1992Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
16.07.1992Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/36]
Appeal following opposition31.07.1992Appeal received No.  T0753/92
13.11.1992Statement of grounds filed
04.04.1995Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
04.04.1995Date of oral proceedings
18.04.1995Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
07.07.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:SearchUS3731145  [ ];
 US3737099  [ ] (SHAFFER P);
 US3815820  [ ];
 US3907202  [ ];
 FR2229207  [ ]