Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0044676 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0044676



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2150
14.07.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.07.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.07.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.07.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.07.1995 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
14.07.1995 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
14.07.1995 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
05.05.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.05.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.05.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.04.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.04.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.04.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.04.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.04.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.04.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.04.1995 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 17
04.04.1995 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.04.1995 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
16.03.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.03.1995 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
14.03.1995 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
14.03.1995 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
14.03.1995 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
13.03.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.03.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.03.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.02.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.02.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.02.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.02.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
29.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.11.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.10.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
20.10.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
19.10.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.10.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.10.1994 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.10.1994 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.10.1994 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.10.1994 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.10.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
17.10.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
17.10.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
17.10.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
17.10.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
01.10.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.09.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.09.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.09.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.09.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.09.1994 Refund of fees Opposition 1
02.09.1994 Refund of fees Opposition 1
02.09.1994 Refund of fees Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
31.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
31.08.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
31.08.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
04.07.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
08.09.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
06.09.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
06.09.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
06.09.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
06.09.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
06.09.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
06.09.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
06.09.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.09.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.09.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.07.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
07.07.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 3
07.07.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
07.07.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
07.07.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 3
07.07.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 3
07.07.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.06.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
17.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
17.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
17.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
17.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
17.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
17.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
17.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
17.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
17.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.06.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
07.06.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
07.06.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
03.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
03.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
03.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
03.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
03.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
03.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
03.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
03.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
03.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
03.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.06.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.05.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
31.03.1993 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
31.03.1993 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
31.03.1993 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
31.03.1993 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
31.03.1993 Brief communication with time limit Appeal 1
31.03.1993 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
31.03.1993 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
25.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
25.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
25.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
25.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
25.03.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.03.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.03.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.03.1993 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
18.03.1993 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
18.03.1993 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
18.03.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.03.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.03.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.03.1993 Annex Opposition 3
16.03.1993 Annex Opposition 3
16.03.1993 Annex Opposition 3
16.03.1993 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
16.03.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.03.1993 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
04.03.1993 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
09.12.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.12.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.12.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.12.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.12.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.12.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.11.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.11.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.11.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.11.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.11.1992 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.11.1992 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.11.1992 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.11.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.11.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.11.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.11.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
13.11.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.11.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
13.11.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
13.11.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
31.08.1992 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
27.08.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.08.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
27.08.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
27.08.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
31.07.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
20.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.07.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.07.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.07.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.07.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.07.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.07.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.07.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
06.07.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
06.07.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
06.07.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
06.07.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
06.07.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
06.07.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
06.07.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
06.07.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
06.07.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
06.07.1992 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
06.07.1992 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
06.07.1992 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
06.07.1992 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 13
06.07.1992 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 13
06.07.1992 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 13
06.07.1992 Means of redress Opposition 1
06.07.1992 Means of redress Opposition 1
06.07.1992 Means of redress Opposition 1
06.07.1992 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
06.07.1992 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
06.07.1992 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
02.05.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.04.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
24.04.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
24.04.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
23.04.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
23.04.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
23.04.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
23.04.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
23.04.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
23.04.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.04.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.04.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.04.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
23.04.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
23.04.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
23.04.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.04.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
22.04.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
22.04.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
22.04.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
21.04.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.04.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.04.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.04.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
21.04.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
21.04.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
16.04.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
16.04.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
16.04.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.03.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.03.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.03.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
28.02.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.02.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.02.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
13.02.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.02.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.02.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
18.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.11.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.09.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.09.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.09.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.08.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.08.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.08.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.08.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.08.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.08.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.08.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.08.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.08.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.08.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
17.07.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.07.1991 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.07.1991 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.07.1991 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.07.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.07.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.07.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.07.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.07.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.07.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.07.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.07.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.06.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.06.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.06.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
28.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.03.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.03.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
20.03.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
20.03.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 15
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 15
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 15
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
12.03.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
12.03.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 5
12.03.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 5
12.03.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 5
23.01.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.01.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.01.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.01.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.01.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.01.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.01.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.01.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.01.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.01.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.01.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.01.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.01.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.01.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.01.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.01.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.01.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.01.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.11.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.11.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.11.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.11.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.11.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.11.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.10.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.09.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
19.09.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
19.09.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.09.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.09.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.09.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.09.1990 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.1990 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.1990 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.08.1990 Request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
16.08.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
16.08.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
16.08.1990 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
16.08.1990 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
16.08.1990 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
11.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.05.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
02.05.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
02.05.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
02.05.1990 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
02.05.1990 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
02.05.1990 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
26.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
26.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
26.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
05.03.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.02.1990 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
14.02.1990 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
14.02.1990 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
02.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
02.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
02.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
02.02.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.02.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.02.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.12.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.12.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.12.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.10.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
03.10.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
06.09.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
06.09.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
06.09.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
28.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.08.1989 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 8
28.08.1989 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 8
28.08.1989 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 8
06.07.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.07.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.07.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
26.06.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.06.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.06.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.04.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.04.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.04.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.04.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.04.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.04.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.04.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.04.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.04.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.04.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
01.04.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
01.04.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
17.03.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
17.03.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
17.03.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
17.03.1989 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
17.03.1989 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
17.03.1989 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
20.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.02.1989 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
13.02.1989 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
13.02.1989 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
08.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.01.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.01.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
20.01.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
20.01.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
13.01.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.01.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
09.01.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
09.01.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
09.01.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
09.01.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
09.01.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
09.01.1989 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
09.01.1989 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
09.01.1989 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
09.01.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
09.01.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
09.01.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
09.01.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
09.01.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
09.01.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
06.12.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.12.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.12.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.12.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.12.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.12.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.12.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.12.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.12.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.11.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
21.11.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
21.11.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
10.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.10.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
17.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
17.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
13.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
13.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
13.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
06.10.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
06.10.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
06.10.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
06.10.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
06.10.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
06.10.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
05.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
05.10.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.10.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
05.10.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.09.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.09.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.09.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.09.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.09.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.09.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.09.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.09.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.09.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.08.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.08.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.08.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.08.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
17.08.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
17.08.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
17.08.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
17.08.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
17.08.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
03.08.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.08.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.08.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.08.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.08.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.08.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.08.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.08.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.08.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.07.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.07.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.07.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.07.1988 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.1988 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.1988 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.07.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.07.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.07.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.07.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.07.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.07.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.07.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
06.07.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
06.07.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.06.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.06.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.06.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.06.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.06.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.06.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.06.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.06.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.06.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.06.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.06.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.06.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.06.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.06.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.06.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.06.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.06.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.06.1988 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.06.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
30.05.1988 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
28.04.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
23.03.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.03.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.03.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.03.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.03.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.03.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
24.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
24.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
11.02.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.02.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.02.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.02.1988 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.02.1988 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.02.1988 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.01.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.01.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.01.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.01.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.01.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.01.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.12.1987 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.12.1987 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.12.1987 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.12.1987 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.12.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.12.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.12.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.12.1987 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
07.12.1987 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
07.12.1987 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
07.12.1987 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
07.12.1987 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
07.12.1987 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
30.11.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.11.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.11.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.11.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.11.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.11.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.11.1987 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.11.1987 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.11.1987 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.11.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.11.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.11.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.11.1987 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.11.1987 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.11.1987 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.11.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.11.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.11.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.11.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.11.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.11.1987 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.11.1987 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.11.1987 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.11.1987 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.11.1987 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
09.11.1987 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
09.11.1987 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
09.11.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
19.10.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.10.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.10.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.10.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.10.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.10.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.10.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.10.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.10.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.10.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.10.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.10.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
11.09.1987 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.1987 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.1987 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
07.04.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
07.04.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
13.02.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
13.02.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.02.1987 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
08.12.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.11.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
12.11.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
12.11.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
12.11.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.11.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.11.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.10.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
28.10.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.10.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.10.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.10.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.10.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.10.1986 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
28.10.1986 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
28.10.1986 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
27.10.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
27.10.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
23.09.1986 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
23.09.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.08.1986 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
20.08.1986 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
20.08.1986 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
20.08.1986 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
20.08.1986 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
19.08.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
19.08.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.08.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.07.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.07.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
18.07.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 15
18.07.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.07.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.07.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
18.07.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 15
18.07.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
18.07.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 15
18.07.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.07.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.07.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.06.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
18.06.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
18.06.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
18.06.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.06.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.06.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.05.1986 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.05.1986 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.05.1986 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.05.1986 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.05.1986 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.05.1986 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.05.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.05.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.05.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.05.1986 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.05.1986 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.05.1986 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.03.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.03.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.02.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.02.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.02.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.02.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.02.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.02.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.02.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.02.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.02.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.02.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.02.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.02.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.02.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.02.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.01.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.01.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.01.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.01.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.01.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.01.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.01.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.01.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.01.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.01.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.01.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.12.1985 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
18.12.1985 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
18.12.1985 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
18.12.1985 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
18.12.1985 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
18.12.1985 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
14.12.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
14.12.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
14.12.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
10.12.1985 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.12.1985 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.12.1985 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.12.1985 N/A Opposition 1
27.11.1985 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
27.11.1985 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.10.1985 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
29.10.1985 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
29.10.1985 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
28.10.1985 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.10.1985 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.10.1985 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.10.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
26.10.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
26.10.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
24.10.1985 N/A Opposition 1
24.10.1985 N/A Opposition 1
24.10.1985 N/A Opposition 1
17.10.1985 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
17.10.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.10.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.10.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.10.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.10.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.10.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.10.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.10.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.10.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.10.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.10.1985 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
17.10.1985 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
17.10.1985 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
12.10.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
12.10.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
12.10.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
10.10.1985 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.10.1985 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.10.1985 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.10.1985 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
02.10.1985 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
02.10.1985 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
02.10.1985 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.10.1985 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.10.1985 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.12.1984 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.09.1984 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.09.1984 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
29.09.1984 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
10.07.1984 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
15.06.1984 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.04.1984 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.04.1984 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
25.01.1984 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
21.12.1983 Claims Search / examination 2
21.12.1983 Description Search / examination 5
21.12.1983 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.11.1983 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 3
08.09.1983 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.07.1983 Claims Search / examination 3
15.07.1983 Description Search / examination 3
15.07.1983 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.04.1983 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.04.1983 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.04.1983 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.03.1983 Annex Search / examination 27
24.03.1983 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 4
25.02.1983 Claims Search / examination 3
25.02.1983 Description Search / examination 7
25.02.1983 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.10.1982 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
15.07.1982 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
05.07.1982 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
05.07.1982 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
05.07.1982 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
01.02.1982 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
02.12.1981 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.11.1981 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.11.1981 European search report Search / examination 1
24.07.1981 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
24.07.1981 Priority document Search / examination 26
17.07.1981 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.07.1981 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.07.1981 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
10.07.1981 Description Search / examination 14
10.07.1981 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.07.1981 Drawings Search / examination 1
10.07.1981 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 12