blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0046687

EP0046687 - Screening apparatus for paper making stock [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  18.04.1988
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE BLACK CLAWSON COMPANY
605 Clark Street
Middletown, Ohio 45042 / US
[1982/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Secor, Ronald F.
409 Brelsford Avenue
Trenton Ohio / US
[1982/09]
Representative(s)Warren, Anthony Robert, et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Warren, Anthony Robert, et al
Baron warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London
W8 5BU / GB
Former [1982/09]Warren, Anthony Robert, et al
BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date81303873.425.08.1981
[1982/09]
Priority number, dateUS1980018125825.08.1980         Original published format: US 181258
US1981027880329.06.1981         Original published format: US 278803
[1982/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0046687
Date:03.03.1982
Language:EN
[1982/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0046687
Date:21.11.1985
Language:EN
[1985/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1981
ClassificationIPC:D21D5/16, D21D5/02
[1982/09]
CPC:
D21D5/16 (EP); B01D29/17 (EP); B01D29/25 (EP);
B01D29/86 (EP); B01D29/902 (EP); D21D5/026 (EP);
B01D2201/287 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
B01D29/17, B01D29/25, B01D29/86, B01D29/902 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1982/09]
TitleGerman:Siebvorrichtung für Papierfaserstoffaufschwemmungen[1982/09]
English:Screening apparatus for paper making stock[1982/09]
French:Dispositif de tamisage pour pâte à papier[1982/09]
Examination procedure24.08.1982Examination requested  [1982/44]
04.08.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
15.03.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.1985Fee for grant paid
30.05.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.08.1986  19.09.1986  ADMISSIBLE
A. Ahlström Corporation
SF-48601 Karhula / FI
Opponent's representative
Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn, et al, et al
Forresters
15 Hamilton Square
Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [1986/41]
Opponent(s)01  09.08.1986  19.09.1986  ADMISSIBLE
A. Ahlström Corporation
SF-48601 Karhula / FI
Opponent's representative
Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn, et al, et al
POTTS, KERR & CO. 15 Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB
06.10.1986Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.04.1987Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.05.1987Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
09.09.1987Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
29.12.1987Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
08.01.1988Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
09.08.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.11.1985
[1987/19]
Documents cited:SearchUS4105543  [ ] (SEIFERT PETER);
 US4155841  [ ] (CHUPKA DAVID E [US], et al);
 US3617008  [ ] (LAMORT PIERRE)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.