blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0052925

EP0052925 - Method and plant for treating granular or pulverous raw material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  05.05.1986
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.1994Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 07.12.1994 [1994/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F.L. Smidth & Co. A/S
77 Vigerslev Allé DK-2500 Valby
Copenhagen / DK
[N/P]
Former [1982/22]For all designated states
F.L. Smidth & Co. A/S
77 Vigerslev Allé
DK-2500 Valby, Copenhagen / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Touborg, Jorn
77 Vigerslev Alle
DK-2500 Valby Copenhagen / DK
[1984/13]
Former [1982/22]01 / Touborg, J rn
77 Vigerslev Alle
DK-2500 Valby Copenhagen / DK
Representative(s)Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1982/22]Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date81304382.523.09.1981
[1982/22]
Priority number, dateGB1980003772925.11.1980         Original published format: GB 8037729
[1982/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0052925
Date:02.06.1982
Language:EN
[1982/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0052925
Date:28.03.1984
Language:EN
[1984/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1981
ClassificationIPC:C04B7/44, F27D13/00
[1982/22]
CPC:
C04B7/44 (EP,KR)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL [1982/22]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anlage zur Behandlung körnigen oder pulverförmigen Rohmaterials[1982/22]
English:Method and plant for treating granular or pulverous raw material[1982/22]
French:Procédé et installation pour le traitement d'une matière brute granulaire ou pulvérulente[1982/22]
Examination procedure24.08.1982Examination requested  [1982/43]
22.06.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
12.09.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.1983Fee for grant paid
23.09.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.12.1984   
Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz AG
Patentwesen PR-P
D-51057 Köln / DE
 [1985/09]
15.02.1985Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.06.1985Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.06.1985Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M03)
05.10.1985Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
10.12.1985Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
20.12.1985Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1986/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL28.03.1984
[1994/49]
Former [1994/48]NL28.03.1984
Former [1994/45]NL28.03.1984
Former [1985/23]NL28.03.1984
Documents cited:SearchDE2923448  [ ] (LAFARGE CONSEILS);
 [AD]DE2846584  (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG);
 [A]AU490561B  ;
 [A]US4127406  (KREFT WILFRIED, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.