blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0050487

EP0050487 - Pharmaceutical compositions comprising a benzodiazepine drug and a phenanthridine derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.08.1985
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.12.1999 [1999/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
[N/P]
Former [1982/17]For all designated states
PFIZER INC.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, N.Y. 10017 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Koe, Billie Kenneth
41 Woodridge Circle Gales Ferry
New London Connecticut / US
[1982/17]
Representative(s)Graham, Philip Colin Christison, et al
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
[1982/17]
Application number, filing date81304822.016.10.1981
[1982/17]
Priority number, dateUS1980019787217.10.1980         Original published format: US 197872
[1982/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0050487
Date:28.04.1982
Language:EN
[1982/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0050487
Date:26.09.1984
Language:EN
[1984/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.1982
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/55, // (A61K31/55, 31:47)
[1982/17]
CPC:
A61K31/55 (EP,KR,US); A61P25/20 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1982/17]
TitleGerman:Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen mit Gehalt an einem Benzodiazepin-Arzneimittel und einem Phenanthridin-Derivat[1982/17]
English:Pharmaceutical compositions comprising a benzodiazepine drug and a phenanthridine derivative[1982/17]
French:Compositions pharmaceutiques contenant une benzodiazépine thérapeutiquement active et un dérivé de phénanthridine[1982/17]
Examination procedure22.10.1981Examination requested  [1982/17]
27.06.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
28.02.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.1984Fee for grant paid
19.04.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.06.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU31.10.1984
[1999/52]
Documents cited:SearchBE854655  [ ] (PFIZER);
 EP0009386  [ ] (PFIZER [US]);
 US4228169  [ ] (JOHNSON MICHAEL R, et al)
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 93, Nr. 9, 1st September 1980 Abstract 88587a, page 31 Columbus, Ohio, (US) & Nida Res. Monogr. 1979, 27, 84-92 G.M. MILNE et al.: "Stereospecific and Potent Analgetic Activity for Nantradol - a Structurally Novel, Cannabinoid-Related Analgetic" * Abstract *
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 95, Nr. 23, 7th December 1981 Abstract 197572d, page 73 Columbus, Ohio (US) & J. Clin. Pharmacol. 1931, 21(8-9, Suppl.), 406-12 C.L. EHIERS et al.: "Levonantradol Potentiates the Anticonvulsant Effects of Diazepam and Valproic Acid in the Bindling Model of Epilepsy" * Abstract *
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS; Volume 94, Nr. 25, 22th June 1981 Abstract 202577v, pages 32-33 Columbus, Ohio (US) & Eur. J. Pharmacol. 1981, 70(2), 231-5 B.K. KOE: "Levonantradol, a Potent Cannabinoid-Related Analgesic, Antagonizes Haloperidol-Induced Activation of Striatal Dopamine Synthesis" * Abstract *
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 95, Nr. 11, 14th September 1981 Abstract 97546e, page 629 Columbus, Ohio (US) & J. Heterocycl. Chem. 1980, 17(8), 1817-20 M.R. JOHNSON et al.: "Recent Discoveries in the search for Nonopiate Analgetics" * Abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.