blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0050488

EP0050488 - Improvements relating to ventilators [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.1985
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.12.1999 [1999/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COLT INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS A.G.
Baarerstrasse 59
CH-6300 Zug / CH
[1982/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Burtenshaw, Raymond Alfred Frank
111, South Lane
Clanfield Hampshire / GB
[1982/17]
Representative(s)Slight, Geoffrey Charles, et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 2BN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1982/17]Slight, Geoffrey Charles, et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date81304827.916.10.1981
[1982/17]
Priority number, dateGB1980003341416.10.1980         Original published format: GB 8033414
[1982/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0050488
Date:28.04.1982
Language:EN
[1982/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0050488
Date:08.09.1982
Language:EN
[1982/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0050488
Date:13.06.1984
Language:EN
[1984/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.1982
ClassificationIPC:F24F7/02
[1982/17]
CPC:
F24F7/025 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1982/17]
TitleGerman:Ventilatoren[1982/17]
English:Improvements relating to ventilators[1982/17]
French:Ventilateurs[1982/17]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure10.08.1982Examination requested  [1982/42]
29.04.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.10.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
29.11.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.1984Fee for grant paid
03.02.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.03.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU31.10.1984
[1999/52]
Documents cited:Search[X]US2492242  (SHAVER JAMES B);
 [A]GB1061188  (COLT VENTILATION & HEATING LTD);
 [Y]GB1151191  (COLT VENTILATION & HEATING LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.