Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0051986

EP0051986 - Detergent compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  24.06.1991
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For:BE  CH  DE  FR  IT  LI  NL  AT 
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
301 East Sixth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
For:GB 
Procter & Gamble Limited
Hedley House Gosforth
Newcastle upon Tyne NE99 1EE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1982/20]For:BE  CH  DE  FR  IT  LI  NL  AT 
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
301 East Sixth Street
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
For:GB 
Procter & Gamble Limited
Hedley House
Gosforth Newcastle upon Tyne NE99 1EE / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Bell, John George
11 Hyde Terrace
Gosforth Newcastle upon Tyne NE3 1AT / GB
02 / Harris, Richard Geoffrey
"Grey Stones" Stable Green
Mitford Northumberland / GB
[1982/20]
Representative(s)Brooks, Maxim Courtney , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle-upon-Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1982/20]Brooks, Maxim Courtney , et al
Procter & Gamble Limited Whitley Road Longbenton
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date81305266.906.11.1981
[1982/20]
Priority number, dateGB1980003571006.11.1980         Original published format: GB 8035710
[1982/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0051986
Date:19.05.1982
Language:EN
[1982/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0051986
Date:21.07.1982
Language:EN
[1982/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0051986
Date:29.05.1985
Language:EN
[1985/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.1982
ClassificationInternational:C11D1/86
[1982/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1982/20]
TitleGerman:Reinigungsmittelzusammensetzungen[1982/20]
English:Detergent compositions[1982/20]
French:Compositions détergentes[1982/20]
Examination procedure11.01.1983Examination requested  [1983/12]
17.11.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.05.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
16.11.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.1985Fee for grant paid
06.02.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.02.1986  28.04.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
TFP / Patentabteilung
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1986/17]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.1986  28.04.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
TFP / Patentabteilung
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
29.04.1986Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.11.1986Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.11.1986Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
14.03.1987Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
26.06.1987Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
20.07.1988Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.01.1991Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/33]
08.01.1991Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.09.1988Appeal received No.  T0457/88
19.11.1988Statement of grounds filed
08.01.1991Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
08.01.1991Date of oral proceedings
09.01.1991Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [1992/33]CH29.05.1985
LI29.05.1985
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2236925  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]);
 [Y]FR2388882  (HOECHST AG [DE]);
 [Y]DE2911585  (LION FAT OIL CO LTD);
 [A]EP0002084  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]);
 [A]EP0008829  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al);
 [AD]EP0000225  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]);
 [A]EP0000224  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US])
ExaminationUS2577773
 DE2857161
 DE2857163
    - DE-Anm. C9796IVa/23e