Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0051986 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0051986



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 604
21.06.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
21.06.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
09.01.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.01.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.01.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 11
13.12.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
13.12.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
05.12.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.11.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.11.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.10.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
30.10.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
12.10.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.12.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.11.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
19.06.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.06.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
11.05.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.05.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.04.1989 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
20.04.1989 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
01.04.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.01.1989 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.12.1988 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
29.11.1988 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.11.1988 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
10.11.1988 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.09.1988 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.09.1988 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.09.1988 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 34
12.09.1988 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
12.09.1988 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 43
12.09.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 38
20.07.1988 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 10
20.07.1988 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.1988 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
21.03.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.03.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.03.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.03.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.03.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
09.03.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.03.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.03.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
27.02.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
27.01.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 11
27.01.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
27.01.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
27.01.1988 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 4
27.01.1988 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.1988 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.12.1987 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
10.11.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
09.11.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
09.11.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.08.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.07.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.07.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.06.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.06.1987 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
15.05.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
29.04.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.03.1987 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
18.11.1986 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
01.11.1986 Description Opposition 3
01.11.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
01.11.1986 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
26.08.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.08.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.04.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.04.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.04.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 4
04.04.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.04.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.03.1986 Request for documents Opposition 1
07.03.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
06.03.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
06.03.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 8
11.06.1985 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
09.04.1985 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.02.1985 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.02.1985 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
06.02.1985 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.11.1984 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
29.08.1984 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.08.1984 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
10.07.1984 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
21.05.1984 Claims Search / examination 3
21.05.1984 Description Search / examination 26
21.05.1984 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.03.1984 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
17.03.1984 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
17.11.1983 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
06.02.1983 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.01.1983 Written request for examination Search / examination 2
27.07.1982 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
18.05.1982 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.05.1982 European search report Search / examination 2
23.03.1982 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
23.11.1981 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
23.11.1981 Priority document Search / examination 31
06.11.1981 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.11.1981 Claims Search / examination 3
06.11.1981 Description Search / examination 26
06.11.1981 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.11.1981 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
06.11.1981 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 38
06.11.1981 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 34
06.11.1981 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 36
06.11.1981 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
06.11.1981 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 18
06.11.1981 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8