Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0053442 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0053442



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 581
13.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
21.04.1993 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
07.04.1993 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
07.04.1993 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
07.04.1993 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
10.02.1993 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
10.02.1993 Translation of the claims Opposition 4
10.02.1993 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
23.12.1992 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
23.12.1992 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
23.12.1992 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
23.12.1992 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
23.12.1992 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
23.12.1992 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
18.12.1992 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
02.12.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.12.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.12.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.11.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
02.11.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
02.11.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.10.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.10.1992 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 14
26.10.1992 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 13
26.10.1992 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
12.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.09.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.09.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
25.09.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.09.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.08.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
17.07.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.07.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.07.1992 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.07.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
15.07.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
15.07.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
09.07.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.07.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.07.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.07.1992 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.07.1992 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.07.1992 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.10.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.10.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.10.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
01.10.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
04.07.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
15.06.1990 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.06.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.06.1990 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
13.06.1990 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
08.06.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
08.06.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
08.06.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
08.06.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
08.06.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.06.1990 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
19.04.1990 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
07.04.1990 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
12.02.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.02.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.02.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.02.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
02.02.1990 Claims Opposition 1
02.02.1990 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 2
02.02.1990 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
02.02.1990 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.1990 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.1990 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.1990 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
02.02.1990 Text intended for grant Opposition 17
16.11.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
09.11.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
03.11.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.11.1989 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 4
14.10.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.10.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.10.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.10.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.10.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
06.10.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
06.10.1989 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
06.10.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
06.10.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
11.09.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.09.1989 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
07.09.1989 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
05.09.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
28.08.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
29.06.1989 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.06.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
03.05.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
13.04.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
13.04.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.04.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.04.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.04.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.03.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
02.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
02.02.1989 Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.10.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
29.06.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.06.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.06.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.05.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
15.04.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
12.04.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
05.02.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.01.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
25.01.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
08.10.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.10.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.09.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
07.07.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.07.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.06.1987 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.05.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.05.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.05.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.05.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.05.1987 Request for documents Opposition 1
07.05.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.04.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
22.04.1987 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
21.04.1987 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
03.03.1987 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
20.02.1987 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.02.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
10.02.1987 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 1
11.12.1986 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
11.12.1986 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
11.11.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.11.1986 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
17.07.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
17.07.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.07.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.07.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
02.07.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.07.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.06.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
14.06.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
10.06.1986 Authorisation Opposition 1
10.06.1986 N/A Opposition 1
10.06.1986 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
31.05.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
08.10.1985 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
26.07.1985 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.03.1985 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.03.1985 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.03.1985 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
16.03.1985 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
06.03.1985 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
02.01.1985 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 3
06.12.1984 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.12.1984 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
29.10.1984 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
01.10.1984 Claims Search / examination 3
01.10.1984 Claims Search / examination 3
01.10.1984 Description Search / examination 7
01.10.1984 Description Search / examination 7
01.10.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
01.10.1984 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.08.1984 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.06.1984 Annex Search / examination 1
26.06.1984 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
26.06.1984 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.03.1984 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.10.1983 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.07.1983 Written request for examination Search / examination 3
23.07.1983 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
20.05.1983 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
09.03.1983 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.03.1983 European search report Search / examination 1
15.04.1982 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.11.1981 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
25.11.1981 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
24.11.1981 Drawings Search / examination 2
24.11.1981 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.11.1981 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.11.1981 Priority document Search / examination 35
17.11.1981 Priority document Search / examination 29
11.11.1981 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.11.1981 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.11.1981 Claims Search / examination 3
06.11.1981 Description Search / examination 29
06.11.1981 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.11.1981 Drawings Search / examination 2
06.11.1981 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8