Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0052510

EP0052510 - Microencapsulation of water soluble polypeptides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  02.09.1994
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYNTEX (U.S.A.) INC.
3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto
California 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [1982/21]For all designated states
SYNTEX (U.S.A.) INC.
3401 Hillview Avenue
Palo Alto California 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kent, John Scott
10120 Lockwood Drive
Cupertino California 95014 / US
02 / Sanders, Lynda Mary
765 San Antonio Road 65
Palo Alto California 94303 / US
03 / Lewis, Danny Harvey
312 Jackson Circle
Gardendale Alabama 35071 / US
04 / Tice, Thomas Robert
1305 Overland Drive
Birmingham Alabama 35216 / US
[1982/21]
Representative(s)Armitage, Ian Michael , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
York House
23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1982/21]Armitage, Ian Michael , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date81305426.917.11.1981
[1982/21]
Priority number, dateUS1980020786418.11.1980         Original published format: US 207864
[1982/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0052510
Date:26.05.1982
Language:EN
[1982/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0052510
Date:08.09.1982
Language:EN
[1982/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0052510
Date:27.08.1986
Language:EN
[1986/35]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0052510
Date:19.10.1994
Language:EN
[1994/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.1982
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/50, A61K9/52
[1982/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1982/21]
TitleGerman:Mikroverkapslung wasserlöslicher Polypeptide[1982/21]
English:Microencapsulation of water soluble polypeptides[1982/21]
French:Microencapsulation de polypeptides hydrosolubles[1982/21]
Examination procedure21.02.1983Examination requested  [1983/19]
24.10.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.06.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
14.01.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.1986Fee for grant paid
08.02.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.09.1986  28.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
DEBIOPHARM S.A.
38, rue du Petit-Chêne
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o Debiopharm S.A.
15-17, Rue des Terreaux
Case Postale 82
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
 02  26.09.1986  14.10.1986  ADMISSIBLE
IPSEN BIOTECH société au nom collectif
30 rue Cambronne
F-75737 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Lachassagne, Jacques
B.P. 07
F-78431 Louveciennes Cedex / FR
 03  02.04.1987  05.05.1987  ADMISSIBLE
The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
6823 St. Charles Avenue
New Orleans, LA 70118 / US
Opponent's representative
Abitz, Walter
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
 04  12.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  15.05.1987  19.06.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Deghenghi, Romano
CH-1141 Denens / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o Debiopharm S.A.
15-17, Rue des Terreaux
Case Postale 82
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
 06  26.05.1987  06.07.1987  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
14th Street and Sheridan Road
North Chicago, Illinois 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Modiano, Guido
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
 07  20.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd
3-6; Doshomachi 2-chome; Chuo-ku;
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Beil, Hans Christoph
BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL
Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 80 01 40
65901 Frankfurt / DE
 08  22.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Ferring Arzneimittel GmbH
Wittland 11
D-24109 Kiel / DE
Opponent's representative
Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 09  26.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
ARES-SERONO N.V.
2, Chemin des Mines
CH-1202 Geneva / CH
Opponent's representative
Kraus, Walter
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 10  27.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Stolle Research & Development Corporation
6990 Cornell Road
Cincinnati, Ohio, 454242 / US
Opponent's representative
Sheard, Andrew Gregory
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [1994/42]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.1986  28.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
DEBIOPHARM S.A.
38, rue du Petit-Chêne
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o Debiopharm S.A. 15-17, Rue des Terreaux Case Postale 82
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
 02  26.09.1986  14.10.1986  ADMISSIBLE
IPSEN BIOTECH société au nom collectif
30 rue Cambronne
F-75737 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Lachassagne, Jacques
B.P. 07
F-78431 Louveciennes Cedex / FR
 03  02.04.1987  05.05.1987  ADMISSIBLE
The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
6823 St. Charles Avenue
New Orleans, LA 70118 / US
Opponent's representative
Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
D-81628 München / DE
 04  12.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  15.05.1987  19.06.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Deghenghi, Romano
CH-1141 Denens / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o Debiopharm S.A. 15-17, Rue des Terreaux Case Postale 82
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
 06  26.05.1987  06.07.1987  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
14th Street and Sheridan Road
North Chicago, Illinois 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing.
Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16
I-20123 Milano / IT
 07  20.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd
3-6; Doshomachi 2-chome; Chuo-ku;
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Beil, Hans Chr., Dr.
BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL, Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40
D-65901 Frankfurt / DE
 08  22.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Ferring Arzneimittel GmbH
Wittland 11
D-24109 Kiel / DE
Opponent's representative
Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 09  26.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
ARES-SERONO N.V.
2, Chemin des Mines
CH-1202 Geneva / CH
Opponent's representative
Kraus, Walter, Dr.
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
 10  27.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Stolle Research & Development Corporation
6990 Cornell Road
Cincinnati, Ohio, 454242 / US
Opponent's representative
Sheard, Andrew Gregory
Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street
London WC1N 2DD / GB
Former [1993/12]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.1986  28.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
DEBIOPHARM S.A.
38, rue du Petit-Chêne
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o Debiopharm S.A. 15-17, Rue des Terreaux Case Postale 82
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
 02  26.09.1986  14.10.1986  ADMISSIBLE
IPSEN BIOTECH société au nom collectif
30 rue Cambronne
F-75737 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Lachassagne, Jacques
Boite Postale 07
F-78430 Louveciennes / FR
 03  02.04.1987  05.05.1987  ADMISSIBLE
The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
6823 St. Charles Avenue
New Orleans, LA 70118 / US
Opponent's representative
Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
D-81628 München / DE
 04  12.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  15.05.1987  19.06.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Deghenghi, Romano
CH-1141 Denens / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o Debiopharm S.A. 15-17, Rue des Terreaux Case Postale 82
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
 06  26.05.1987  06.07.1987  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
14th Street and Sheridan Road
North Chicago, Illinois 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing.
Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16
I-20123 Milano / IT
 07  20.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd
3-6; Doshomachi 2-chome; Chuo-ku;
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Beil, Hans Chr., Dr.
BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL, Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40
D-65901 Frankfurt / DE
 08  22.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Ferring Arzneimittel GmbH
Wittland 11
D-24109 Kiel / DE
Opponent's representative
Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 09  26.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
ARES-SERONO N.V.
2, Chemin des Mines
CH-1202 Geneva / CH
Opponent's representative
Kraus, Walter, Dr.
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
 10  27.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Stolle Research & Development Corporation
6990 Cornell Road
Cincinnati, Ohio, 454242 / US
Opponent's representative
Sheard, Andrew Gregory
Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street
London WC1N 2DD / GB
Former [1990/16]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.1986  28.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
DEBIOPHARM S.A.
38, rue du Petit-Chêne
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o Debiopharm S.A. 15-17, Rue des Terreaux Case Postale 82
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
 02  26.09.1986  14.10.1986  ADMISSIBLE
IPSEN BIOTECH société au nom collectif
30 rue Cambronne
F-75737 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Lachassagne, Jacques
Boite Postale 07
F-78430 Louveciennes / FR
 03  02.04.1987  05.05.1987  ADMISSIBLE
The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
6823 St. Charles Avenue
New Orleans, LA 70118 / US
Opponent's representative
Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
D-81628 München / DE
 04  12.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  15.05.1987  19.06.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Deghenghi, Romano
CH-1141 Denens / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o Debiopharm S.A. 15-17, Rue des Terreaux Case Postale 82
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
 06  26.05.1987  06.07.1987  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
14th Street and Sheridan Road
North Chicago, Illinois 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing.
Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16
I-20123 Milano / IT
 07  20.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd
3-6; Doshomachi 2-chome; Chuo-ku;
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Beil, Hans Chr., Dr.
BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL, Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40
D-65901 Frankfurt / DE
 08  22.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Ferring Arzneimittel GmbH
Wittland 11
D-24109 Kiel / DE
Opponent's representative
Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 09  26.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
ARES-SERONO N.V.
2, Chemin des Mines
CH-1202 Geneva / CH
Opponent's representative
Kraus, Walter, Dr.
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
 10  27.05.1987  30.09.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Stolle Research & Development Corporation
6990 Cornell Road
Cincinnati, Ohio, 454242 / US
Opponent's representative
Sheard, Andrew Gregory
Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street
London WC1N 2DD / GB
Former [1987/35]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.1986  28.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
DEBIOPHARM S.A.
38, rue du Petit-Chêne
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, rue du Mont-Blanc Case Postale 1736
CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH
 02  26.09.1986  14.10.1986  ADMISSIBLE
IPSEN BIOTECH société au nom collectif
30 rue Cambronne
F-75737 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Lachassagne, Jacques
Boite Postale 07
F-78430 Louveciennes / FR
 03  02.04.1987   
The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
6823 St. Charles Avenue
New Orleans, LA 70118 / US
Opponent's representative
Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
D-81628 München / DE
 04  12.05.1987   
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  15.05.1987   
Deghenghi, Romano
CH-1141 Denens / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, rue du Mont-Blanc Case Postale 1736
CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH
 06  26.05.1987  06.07.1987  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
14th Street and Sheridan Road
North Chicago, Illinois 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing.
Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16
I-20123 Milano / IT
 07  20.05.1987   
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd
3-6; Doshomachi 2-chome; Chuo-ku;
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Beil, Hans Chr., Dr.
BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL, Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40
D-65901 Frankfurt / DE
 08  22.05.1987   
Ferring Arzneimittel GmbH
Wittland 11
D-24109 Kiel / DE
Opponent's representative
Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 09  26.05.1987   
ARES-SERONO N.V.
2, Chemin des Mines
CH-1202 Geneva / CH
Opponent's representative
Kraus, Walter, Dr.
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
 10  27.05.1987   
Stolle Research & Development Corporation
6990 Cornell Road
Cincinnati, Ohio, 454242 / US
Opponent's representative
Sheard, Andrew Gregory
Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street
London WC1N 2DD / GB
Former [1987/30]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.1986  28.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
DEBIOPHARM S.A.
38, rue du Petit-Chêne
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, rue du Mont-Blanc Case Postale 1736
CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH
 02  26.09.1986  14.10.1986  ADMISSIBLE
IPSEN BIOTECH société au nom collectif
30 rue Cambronne
F-75737 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Lachassagne, Jacques
Boite Postale 07
F-78430 Louveciennes / FR
 03  02.04.1987   
The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
6823 St. Charles Avenue
New Orleans, LA 70118 / US
Opponent's representative
Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
D-81628 München / DE
 04  12.05.1987   
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  15.05.1987   
Deghenghi, Romano
CH-1141 Denens / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, rue du Mont-Blanc Case Postale 1736
CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH
 07  20.05.1987   
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd
3-6; Doshomachi 2-chome; Chuo-ku;
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Beil, Hans Chr., Dr.
BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL, Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40
D-65901 Frankfurt / DE
 08  22.05.1987   
Ferring Arzneimittel GmbH
Wittland 11
D-24109 Kiel / DE
Opponent's representative
Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 09  26.05.1987   
ARES-SERONO N.V.
2, Chemin des Mines
CH-1202 Geneva / CH
Opponent's representative
Kraus, Walter, Dr.
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
 10  27.05.1987   
Stolle Research & Development Corporation
6990 Cornell Road
Cincinnati, Ohio, 454242 / US
Opponent's representative
Sheard, Andrew Gregory
Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street
London WC1N 2DD / GB
Former [1987/29]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.1986  28.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
DEBIOPHARM S.A.
38, rue du Petit-Chêne
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, rue du Mont-Blanc Case Postale 1736
CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH
 02  26.09.1986  14.10.1986  ADMISSIBLE
IPSEN BIOTECH société au nom collectif
30 rue Cambronne
F-75737 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Lachassagne, Jacques
Boite Postale 07
F-78430 Louveciennes / FR
 03  02.04.1987   
The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
6823 St. Charles Avenue
New Orleans, LA 70118 / US
Opponent's representative
Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
D-81628 München / DE
 04  12.05.1987   
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  15.05.1987   
Deghenghi, Romano
CH-1141 Denens / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, rue du Mont-Blanc Case Postale 1736
CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH
 07  20.05.1987   
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd
3-6; Doshomachi 2-chome; Chuo-ku;
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Beil, Hans Chr., Dr.
BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL, Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40
D-65901 Frankfurt / DE
Former [1987/28]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.1986  28.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
DEBIOPHARM S.A.
38, rue du Petit-Chêne
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, rue du Mont-Blanc Case Postale 1736
CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH
 02  26.09.1986  14.10.1986  ADMISSIBLE
IPSEN BIOTECH société au nom collectif
30 rue Cambronne
F-75737 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Lachassagne, Jacques
Boite Postale 07
F-78430 Louveciennes / FR
 03  02.04.1987   
The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
6823 St. Charles Avenue
New Orleans, LA 70118 / US
Opponent's representative
Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
D-81628 München / DE
 04  12.05.1987   
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  15.05.1987   
Deghenghi, Romano
CH-1141 Denens / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, rue du Mont-Blanc Case Postale 1736
CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH
Former [1987/23]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.1986  28.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
DEBIOPHARM S.A.
38, rue du Petit-Chêne
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, rue du Mont-Blanc Case Postale 1736
CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH
 02  26.09.1986  14.10.1986  ADMISSIBLE
IPSEN BIOTECH société au nom collectif
30 rue Cambronne
F-75737 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Lachassagne, Jacques
Boite Postale 07
F-78430 Louveciennes / FR
 03  02.04.1987   
The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
6823 St. Charles Avenue
New Orleans, LA 70118 / US
Opponent's representative
Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
D-81628 München / DE
Former [1987/18]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.1986  28.11.1986  ADMISSIBLE
DEBIOPHARM S.A.
38, rue du Petit-Chêne
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Lachassagne, Jacques, et al
Boite Postale 07
F-78430 Louveciennes / FR
 02  26.09.1986  14.10.1986  ADMISSIBLE
IPSEN BIOTECH société au nom collectif
30 rue Cambronne
F-75737 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
Former [1986/47]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.1986   
DEBIOPHARM S.A.
38, rue du Petit-Chêne
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Vuille, Roman, et al
c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, rue du Mont-Blanc Case Postale 1736
CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH
 02  26.09.1986   
IPSEN BIOTECH société au nom collectif
30 rue Cambronne
F-75737 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
01.10.1987Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.07.1988Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.07.1988Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M08)
31.03.1989Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
23.02.1990Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08)
08.11.1990Reply to a communication from the opposition division
28.03.1991Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.11.1993Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.05.1994Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
16.06.1994Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition17.05.1991Appeal received No.  T0456/91
25.07.1991Statement of grounds filed
03.11.1993Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
03.11.1993Date of oral proceedings
15.11.1993Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE2051580  ;
 [Y]FR2400904  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]);
 [Y]FR2400950  (SANDOZ SA [CH]);
 [XPD]US4234571  (NESTOR JOHN J, et al)