blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0041438

EP0041438 - Hydrodynamic auxiliary bearing in motor-driven pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1981/49]Hydrodynamic auxiliary bearing for motor-driven pump
[1983/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.04.1984
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.1984No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.06.1984 [1984/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JEUMONT-SCHNEIDER Société anonyme dite:
31-32, Quai de Dion Bouton
F-92811 Puteaux Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1981/49]For all designated states
JEUMONT-SCHNEIDER Société anonyme dite:
31-32, Quai de Dion Bouton
F-92811 Puteaux Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Drevet, Michel
65, Boulevard des Belges
F-69008 Lyon / FR
02 / Trouillet, Jean
1, Place Desoil
B-6940 Fontaine-Valmont / BE
[1981/49]
Representative(s)Lejet, Christian, et al
31-32, Quai de Dion Bouton
F-92811 Puteaux Cedex / FR
[1981/49]
Application number, filing date81400828.025.05.1981
[1981/49]
Priority number, dateFR1980001217902.06.1980         Original published format: FR 8012179
[1981/49]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0041438
Date:09.12.1981
Language:FR
[1981/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0041438
Date:11.05.1983
Language:FR
[1983/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.1981
ClassificationIPC:F04D29/04, F16C17/20
[1981/49]
CPC:
F04D29/047 (EP,US); F04D29/04 (KR); F04D29/2261 (EP,US);
F04D29/5866 (EP,US); F16C17/20 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1981/49]
TitleGerman:Hydrodynamisches Hilfslager in Motorpumpeneinheit[1983/19]
English:Hydrodynamic auxiliary bearing in motor-driven pump[1983/19]
French:Palier hydrodynamique auxiliaire dans un groupe motopompe[1983/19]
Former [1981/49]Hydrodynamisches Hilfslager für Motorpumpeneinheit
Former [1981/49]Hydrodynamic auxiliary bearing for motor-driven pump
Former [1981/49]Palier hydrodynamique auxiliaire pour groupe motopompe
Examination procedure28.01.1982Examination requested  [1982/15]
23.08.1982Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
15.11.1982Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.1983Fee for grant paid
10.01.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.02.1984No opposition filed within time limit [1984/23]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchUS2796027  [ ] (BROWN EDWIN H);
 US3165365  [ ] (EUGEN WIEDEMANN, et al);
 DE2716433  [ ] (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG);
 DE461270  [ ] (WILHELM BECK DIPL ING)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.