blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0070943

EP0070943 - Natural gamma ray spectrum analysis and filtering technique [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.1984
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For:FR  IT 
SOCIETE DE PROSPECTION ELECTRIQUE SCHLUMBERGER
42, rue Saint-Dominique
F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
For:DE  GB  NL 
Schlumberger Limited
277 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10172 / US
[N/P]
Former [1983/06]For:FR  IT 
SOCIETE DE PROSPECTION ELECTRIQUE SCHLUMBERGER
42, rue Saint-Dominique
F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
For:DE  GB  NL 
SCHLUMBERGER LIMITED
277 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10172 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ruckebusch, Guy
36 Shields Lane
Ridgefield Connecticut 06877 / US
[1983/06]
Representative(s)Hagel, Francis, et al
Etudes et Productions Schlumberger A L'ATTENTION DU SERVICE BREVETS 26, rue de la Cavée B.P. 202
92142 Clamart Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1983/06]Hagel, Francis, et al
Etudes et Productions Schlumberger A L'ATTENTION DU SERVICE BREVETS 26, rue de la Cavée B.P. 202
F-92142 Clamart Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date81401249.831.07.1981
[1983/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0070943
Date:09.02.1983
Language:EN
[1983/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.1982
ClassificationIPC:G01V5/06
[1983/06]
CPC:
G01V5/06 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1983/06]
TitleGerman:Analysier- und Filtertechnik für ein natürliches Gammastrahlenspektrum[1983/06]
English:Natural gamma ray spectrum analysis and filtering technique[1983/06]
French:Analyse de spectre de rayons gamma naturels et technique de filtrage[1983/06]
File destroyed:14.07.1990
Examination procedure09.11.1983Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1984/16]
20.01.1984Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1984/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
09.08.1983M02   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchUS4187908  [ ] (FERTL WALTER H [US], et al);
 US2050600  [ ] (COX HENRY L, et al);
 US3976878  [ ] (CHEVALIER PHILIPPE, et al);
 FR2342507  [ ] (SCHLUMBERGER PROSPECTION [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.