blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0051002

EP0051002 - Automatic speed control system for a heavy vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.1987
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.12.1987 [1987/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLIED CORPORATION
Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown
New Jersey 07960 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/35]For all designated states
ALLIED CORPORATION
Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.)
Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US
Former [1982/18]For all designated states
THE BENDIX CORPORATION
Executive Offices Bendix Center
Southfield Michigan 48037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Krieder, Robert Dale
7 Township Road 581
Sullivan Ohio 44880 / US
[1982/18]
Representative(s)Brullé, Jean, et al
Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad
93700 Drancy / FR
[N/P]
Former [1986/35]Brullé, Jean, et al
Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
Former [1982/18]Maguet, André
Service Brevets Bendix 44, Rue François 1er
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date81401524.402.10.1981
[1982/18]
Priority number, dateUS1980020079827.10.1980         Original published format: US 200798
[1982/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0051002
Date:05.05.1982
Language:EN
[1982/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0051002
Date:10.10.1984
Language:EN
[1984/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0051002
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.1984
ClassificationIPC:B60K31/00, // B60K41/02
[1982/18]
CPC:
B60K26/04 (EP,US); B60K31/105 (EP,US); F02D11/10 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0042 (EP); B60W2720/106 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1982/18]
TitleGerman:Automatische Geschwindigkeitssteueranlage für schwere Fahrzeuge[1982/18]
English:Automatic speed control system for a heavy vehicle[1982/18]
French:Système de commande automatique de vitesse de véhicule lourd[1982/18]
Examination procedure14.10.1981Examination requested  [1982/18]
08.11.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
27.06.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.1986Fee for grant paid
27.08.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.10.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
10.10.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
19.09.1986Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3763954  (PERMUT A, et al);
 [X]DE2835942  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT);
 [A]US4138723  (NEHMER CARL A, et al);
 [XP]GB2055337  (CROWN CONTROLS CORP)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.