blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0050550

EP0050550 - In-line flow rotatable gate valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.02.1986
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.1986No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.04.1986 [1986/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique
31-33, rue de la Fédération, Boîte Postale 150
75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1982/17]For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel
31/33, rue de la Fédération
F-75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Pruvot, Jean
27, Avenue de Normandie
F-93160 Noisy le Grand / FR
02 / Roquefort, André
39, Avenue des Acacias
F-92140 Clamart / FR
[1982/17]
Representative(s)Mongrédien, André, et al
c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu
F-75008 Paris / FR
[1982/17]
Application number, filing date81401560.808.10.1981
[1982/17]
Priority number, dateFR1980002226317.10.1980         Original published format: FR 8022263
[1982/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0050550
Date:28.04.1982
Language:FR
[1982/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0050550
Date:10.04.1985
Language:FR
[1985/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.1982
ClassificationIPC:F16K3/10
[1982/17]
CPC:
F16K3/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI [1982/17]
TitleGerman:Durchflussschieber mit drehbarem Antrieb[1982/17]
English:In-line flow rotatable gate valve[1982/17]
French:Vanne à passage direct et à commande rotative[1982/17]
Examination procedure02.10.1982Examination requested  [1982/50]
05.12.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.05.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
28.09.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.1984Fee for grant paid
03.12.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.01.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US1742828  (SCHMALZ CHARLES H);
 [A]FR1262734  (LORRAINE ESCAUT SA)
ExaminationDE1903817U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.