blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0062728

EP0062728 - A heating system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.01.1987
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.01.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.03.1987 [1987/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Atlas Copco Aktiebolag
Nacka
105 23 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1984/45]For all designated states
Atlas Copco Aktiebolag
Nacka
S-105 23 Stockholm / SE
Former [1983/27]For all designated states
Cinderella AB
Arsenalgatan 8C
S-111 47 Stockholm / SE
Former [1982/42]For all designated states
Stahl, Donald
Box 198
S-434 01 Kungsbacka / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Möll, Thorleif
P.O. Box 75
S-430 33 Fjäras / SE
[1982/42]
Representative(s)Grundfelt, Erik Gunnar, et al
Atlas Copco Rock Drills AB, Patents
S-105 23 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1984/45]Grundfelt, Erik Gunnar, et al
Atlas Copco Tunnelling & Mining AB Patents & Trademarks
S-105 23 Stockholm / SE
Former [1982/42]Linde, Leif
Vernamo Patentbyra AB, Persegard
S-274 00 Skurup / SE
Application number, filing date81850067.015.04.1981
[1982/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0062728
Date:20.10.1982
Language:EN
[1982/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0062728
Date:05.03.1986
Language:EN
[1986/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.1981
ClassificationIPC:F24J3/00, F24H1/18, F24D11/02, F25B29/00
[1986/10]
CPC:
F24H1/187 (EP,US); F24D11/0214 (EP,US); F24H4/04 (EP,US);
F25B30/02 (EP,US); F25B49/027 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1982/42]F24J3/04, F24H1/18, F24D11/02, F25B29/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1982/42]
TitleGerman:Heizsystem[1982/42]
English:A heating system[1982/42]
French:Système de chauffage[1982/42]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure19.04.1983Examination requested  [1983/27]
19.10.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10)
17.08.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
23.08.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.1985Fee for grant paid
25.10.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.04.1982DE   M02   Fee paid on   15.06.1982
15.04.1982FR   M02   Fee paid on   15.06.1982
15.04.1982GB   M02   Fee paid on   15.06.1982
15.04.1982NL   M02   Fee paid on   15.06.1982
15.04.1982SE   M02   Fee paid on   15.06.1982
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE2604942  [ ] (SCHMIDT KARL DR ING);
 DE7816917U  [ ];
 US4143523  [ ] (BURGER MANFRED R, et al);
 DE2853035  [ ] (TEKNOTERM SYSTEMS AB);
 DE7909381U  [ ];
 DE8021463U  [ ];
 DE8019565U  [ ];
 DE3032953  [ ] (VOGEL PUMPEN [AT])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.